Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Solomon Oliver, Jr
Case #: 1:25-cv-00160
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Thu 05/01 3:52 PM
Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon Four or More Unnamed Officers of Willoughby Police Department on 4/30/2025, filed on behalf of Michael Darnell Perry, Jr. Related document(s)4 . (S,DA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 service Return of Service Unexecuted Wed 04/30 11:55 AM
Return of Service by U.S. Marshal unexecuted upon Two or More Unnamed Staff Members of Lake West Hospital. Service attempted by U.S. Marshal on 4/28/2025. Unable to serve/locate "Unnamed Staff Members". Will serve if staff members are identified. Filed on behalf of Michael Darnell Perry, Jr. Related document(s)4 . (S,DA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 04/23 3:14 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Four or More Unnamed Officers of Willoughby Police Department, Two or More Unnamed Staff Members of Lake West Hospital. (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Willoughby PD Summons,
Att: 2 USM Forms Issued
3 3 3 pgs order Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis Wed 04/23 3:00 PM
Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis Related [+]. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915, the total filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00 is due. See Order for additional instructions and information. Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd on 4/23/2025.(D,JJ)
Related: [-] 2
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Wed 04/23 3:02 PM
Copy of3 Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, mailed to Michael Darnell Perry, Jr. #A810955 at Lake Erie Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8000, Conneaut, OH 44030, and to Lake Erie Correctional Institution, Attn: Prison Cashier's Office, P.O. Box 8000, Conneaut, OH 44030, and to Clerk of Court, Northern District of Ohio, Attn: Financial Office, Cleveland, OH on 4/23/2025. (D,JJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/30 12:46 PM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Michael Darnell Perry, Jr.. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Inmate Demand Statement,
Att: 3 Lake Erie Correctional Institution Cashier's Demand Statement
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/30 12:38 PM
Complaint for Damages (42 U.S.C. § 1983; Civil Conspiracy; and Infliction of Emotional Distress) with jury demand against Four or More Unnamed Officers of Willoughby Police Department, Two or More Unnamed Staff Members of Lake West Hospital. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Michael Darnell Perry, Jr.. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summonses,
Att: 3 USM-285,
Att: 4 Envelope
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 01/30 12:43 PM
Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 01/30 12:43 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]