Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-20212

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 12
Judge:Robert L Jones
Case #: 2:25-ap-02001
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Enrique H Fehr
1912 Seminole Trl
Dalhart, TX 79022
Represented By
Enrique H Fehr
contact info
Defendant
Anna L Fehr
1912 Seminole Trl
Dalhart, TX 79022
Represented By
Anna L Fehr
contact info
Defendant
H&J Farms LLC
1912 Seminole Trl
Dalhart, TX 79022
Represented By
H&J Farms LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Agrifund, LLC
420 Throckmorton Street Suite 1100
Fort Worth, TX 76102
Represented By
Michael S. Smiley
Underwood Law Firm
contact info
Samantha Espino
Underwood Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
16 16 order Continue Thu 05/01 4:46 PM
Order granting motion to continue hearing on Related [+]. IT IS ORDERED that the Docket Call in this adversary proceeding is continued and reset for the Court's regularly scheduled trial docket call in April 2026. The Docket Call will be held via WebEx. Entered on 5/1/2025. (Hyden, Kara)
Related: [-] 8 Complaint
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
15 15 court Hearing held Thu 04/24 11:10 AM
Status Conference held on 4/16/2025 re:6 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendants Anna L Fehr, Enrique H Fehr, H&J Farms LLC) (STATUS CONFERENCE HELD) (Ferrufino, Sara)
Related: [-]
14 14 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Wed 04/16 11:21 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order reassigning case - Judge Robert L Jones terminated. Judge Scott W Everett assigned. Entered on 4/14/2025 (Ecker, C.)
13 13 notice Notice of hearing Wed 04/16 12:42 PM
Amended Notice of hearing filed by Defendants Anna L Fehr, Enrique H Fehr, H&J Farms LLC Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 4/16/2025 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/everett. (Northern, Van)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Anna L Fehr, Defendant Enrique H Fehr, Defendant H&J Farms LLC
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
12 12 notice Notice (generic) Tue 04/15 5:44 PM
NOTICE REGARDING HEARING ON 4/16/2025 AT 1:30pm Related [+]. Due to the recent reassignment of this case, the hearing set 4/16/2025 will be converted to a STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Everett on 4/16/2025 at 1:30pm - WebEx Link: https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/everett (Ellison, Traci)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Anna L Fehr, Defendant Enrique H Fehr, Defendant H&J Farms LLC
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 order Reassigning case Mon 04/14 4:39 PM
Order reassigning case - Judge Robert L Jones terminated. Judge Scott W Everett assigned. Entered on 4/14/2025 (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
10 10 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Fri 04/11 4:57 PM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Agrifund, LLC Related [+]. (Espino, Samantha)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding ,9 Response
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (part one)
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 (part two)
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 answer Response Mon 03/24 5:02 PM
Response opposed to Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Agrifund, LLC. (Smiley, Michael)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Anna L Fehr, Defendant Enrique H Fehr, Defendant H&J Farms LLC
Monday, March 17, 2025
8 8 motion Continue Mon 03/17 9:12 AM
Agreed Motion to continue hearing on Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Agrifund, LLC (Espino, Samantha)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons issued
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of hearing Tue 03/04 12:27 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendants Anna L Fehr, Enrique H Fehr, H&J Farms LLC Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 4/16/2025 at 01:30 PM Amarillo, (VIDEO) U. S. Courthouse, 205 Southeast Fifth Ave., Amarillo, Texas 79101 for6 , (Northern, Van)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Anna L Fehr, Defendant Enrique H Fehr, Defendant H&J Farms LLC
Monday, March 03, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss adversary proceeding Mon 03/03 12:25 PM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendants Anna L Fehr, Enrique H Fehr, H&J Farms LLC (Northern, Van)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 5 misc Certificate (generic) Mon 02/03 12:45 PM
Certificate Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Agrifund, LLC. (Smiley, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
4 4 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Fri 01/31 3:35 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 6/18/2025 at 01:30 PM Amarillo via WebEX. Entered on 1/31/2025 (Graham, C.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Agrifund, LLC
3 3 court Summons issued Fri 01/31 3:30 PM
Summons issued on Anna L Fehr Answer Due 3/3/2025; Enrique H Fehr Answer Due 3/3/2025; H&J Farms LLC Answer Due 3/3/2025 (Graham, C.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
2 2 misc Adversary proceeding cover sheet Wed 01/29 3:40 PM
Adversary proceeding cover sheet filed by Plaintiff Agrifund, LLC Related [+]. (Espino, Samantha)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/29 3:36 PM
Adversary case 25-02001 Complaint by Agrifund, LLC against Enrique H Fehr, Anna L Fehr, H&J Farms LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny). 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury). (Espino, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D