Li et al v. GBL Logistics, Inc. et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 4:25-cv-00081 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle ( |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2025 |
Case in other court: | 96th Judicial District, Tarrant County TX, 096-359792-24 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:51 AM CDT |
Defendant
GBL Logistics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Susic Sinisa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cao Hongbo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xiao Hu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zhi Li
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Related Case Plaintiffs' Certificate of Written Discovery filed by Zhi Li (Hudson, James) |
|
10 | 10
![]() CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zhi Li. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hudson, James) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 4/28/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2025. Motions due by 9/8/2025. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/9/2025. Discovery due by 8/8/2025. Pretrial Order due by 12/11/2025. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning January 5, 2026. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/27/2025) (mmw) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order JOINT REPORT ON RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY PLAN by GBL Logistics, Inc., Susic Sinisa. (Mayfield, Jordan) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Non-Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge filed by GBL Logistics, Inc., Susic Sinisa (Mayfield, Jordan) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Defendant Sinisa Susic's Consent re:1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Susic Sinisa (Mayfield, Jordan) |
|
5 | 5
![]() CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GBL Logistics, Inc., Susic Sinisa. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Mayfield, Jordan) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before February 28, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/31/2025) (mmw) |
|
Thursday, January 30, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: Judge O'Connor Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by GBL Logistics, Inc.. (Filer fee note- Fee paid in case 096-359792-24.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Mayfield, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |