Florida Middle District Court
Judge:William F Jung
Referred: Thomas G Wilson
Case #: 8:25-cv-00253
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:20 AM EDT
Defendant
MEGHDIV Management, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Wilcox
Hill Ward Henderson, PA
contact info
Carmen Cato
Hill Ward Henderson
contact info
Defendant
Shree Sai, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Wilcox
Hill Ward Henderson, PA
contact info
Carmen Cato
Hill Ward Henderson
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommy Hillard
Represented By
Amanda E. Heystek
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, P.A.
contact info
Nikole Miller
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
20 20 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 04/02 8:57 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery is due by 3/4/2026. Dispositive motions are due by 4/3/2026. Pretrial statement is due by 8/6/2026. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/13/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung Jury Trial is set for the September 2026 Trial Term commencing 9/7/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/2/2025. (JCG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
19 19 misc Case Management Report Tue 04/01 5:10 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
18 18 order Order Fri 03/28 9:39 AM
ENDORSED ORDER directing the parties to file a joint Uniform Case Management Report on or before April 9, 2025. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/28/2025. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
17 17 minutes Case Management Conference Fri 03/21 11:48 AM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 3/21/2025. (DIGITAL) (KMN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 03/11 9:35 AM
NOTICE of hearing: re:6 Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2025 at 11:45 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (KMN)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion for Hearing / Conference Tue 03/11 9:34 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Motion for Hearing / Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/11/2025. (KMN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
14 14 motion Hearing / Conference Wed 03/05 3:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Case Management Conference re6 Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program by Tommy Hillard. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 03/04 3:35 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by MEGHDIV Management, LLC. (Wilcox, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 03/04 3:34 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Shree Sai, LLC. (Wilcox, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/26 12:46 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by MEGHDIV Management, LLC.(Wilcox, Jeffrey) Modified text on 2/27/2025 (KME)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/26 12:45 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Shree Sai, LLC.(Wilcox, Jeffrey) Modified text on 2/27/2025 (KME)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 02/10 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Amanda E. Heystek on behalf of Tommy Hillard. Lead Counsel: Amanda Heystek. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/07 9:22 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Tommy Hillard. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 02/07 9:21 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Tommy Hillard. Related case(s): Yes (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
4 4 service Summons issued Mon 02/03 10:03 AM
SUMMONS issued as to MEGHDIV Management, LLC, Shree Sai, LLC. (ELA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Thu 02/06 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (KMN)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Order Thu 02/06 9:47 AM
STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/31/2025. (KMN)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/31 3:22 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:25-cv-253-WFJ-TGW. (RN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 01/30 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Amanda E. Heystek on behalf of Tommy Hillard. Lead Counsel: Amanda Heystek. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/30 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22968991) filed by Tommy Hillard.(Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons