Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Case #: 0:25-cv-60169
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:05 AM EDT
Defendant
MSC Cruises, S.A.
Plaintiff
HEATHER DAMICO
Represented By
Nicholas Mitchell Plymale
Gerson And Schwartz
contact info
Philip Maurice Gerson
Gerson & Schwartz
contact info
Nicholas I. Gerson
Gerson & Schwartz PA
contact info
Edward Steven Schwartz
Gerson & Schwartz PA
contact info
David L Markel
Gerson And Schwartz, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/30 10:10 AM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by HEATHER DAMICO (Gerson, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 04/17 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rafaela Patricia Castells on behalf of MSC Cruises, S.A.. Attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells added to party MSC Cruises, S.A.(pty:dft). (Castells, Rafaela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/08 2:37 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSC Cruises, S.A. (Holman, Steve)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/08 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steve Holman on behalf of MSC Cruises, S.A.. Attorney Steve Holman added to party MSC Cruises, S.A.(pty:dft). (Holman, Steve)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/08 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Bradford Maltzman on behalf of MSC Cruises, S.A.. Attorney Jeffrey Bradford Maltzman added to party MSC Cruises, S.A.(pty:dft). (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/07 3:01 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by MSC Cruises, S.A.. Attorney Mathew Christopher Renik added to party MSC Cruises, S.A.(pty:dft). Related [+]
Related: [-] nik, Mathew
Monday, February 10, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 02/10 1:22 PM
ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/10/2025. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/04 9:32 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HEATHER DAMICO. MSC Cruises, S.A. waiver sent on 2/4/2025, response/answer due 4/7/2025. (Gerson, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 01/30 4:25 PM
Summons Issued as to MSC Cruises, S.A.. (amb)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 01/30 4:22 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/30 4:04 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against MSC Cruises, S.A.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18166310, filed by HEATHER DAMICO.(Gerson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet