Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert J White
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:25-cv-10270
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2025
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Battle Creek, City of
Defendant
Christian T. Fields
Defendant
David K. Heiss
Defendant
Kole Lewis Kellems
Plaintiff
Roosevelt Lashawn Williams
554 Boynton Ave
Benton Harbor, MI 49022

GPO Mar 05 2025
OPINION and ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 2 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis and Dismissing the 5 Amended Complaint with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 misc Docket Annotation Thu 04/17 7:15 AM
DOCUMENT filed by Roosevelt L. Williams [COPY OF COURT OF APPEALS FILING] [Pro Se Upload] (TTho)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
11 11 appeal Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit* Mon 03/17 2:34 PM
Certificate of Service re10 Notice of Appeal. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
10 10 appeal Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit Mon 03/17 2:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Roosevelt Lashawn Williams re8 Memorandum Opinion & Order,9 Judgment. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. [SUBMITTED THROUGH PRO SE PORTAL] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
9 9 order Judgment* Wed 03/05 10:12 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
8 8 8 pgs order Memorandum Opinion & Order Wed 03/05 10:08 AM
OPINION and ORDER Granting Plaintiff's2 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis and Dismissing the5 Amended Complaint with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 03/05 10:14 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re8 Opinion & Order and9 Judgment on Roosevelt Lashawn Williams at 554 Boynton Ave., Benton Harbor, MI 49022. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
7 7 misc Letter Mon 03/03 3:35 PM
Document from Roosevelt Lashawn Williams (JPar) [PRO SE DOCUMENT UPLOAD] Modified on 3/3/2025 (JPar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Fee Waiver,
Att: 2 SSA Benefit Verification Letter,
Att: 3 Violation of Constitutional Rights Tort Claim
Friday, February 07, 2025
6 6 misc Addendum Mon 02/10 9:08 AM
ADDENDUM re2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Roosevelt Lashawn Williams. [Pro Se Document Upload] (JHea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
5 5 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Fri 02/07 9:11 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Roosevelt Lashawn Williams against All Defendants. [Pro Se Document Upload] (JPar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Violation of Constitutional Rights Tort Claim
Friday, January 31, 2025
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Fri 01/31 10:40 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (CShr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Thu 01/30 11:27 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Roosevelt Lashawn Williams. (JPar)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 01/30 11:25 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Roosevelt Lashawn Williams against All Defendants (JPar)
Related: [-]