Delaware District Court
Judge:Maryellen Noreika
Case #: 1:25-cv-00121
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
14 14 misc State Court Record Wed 04/30 8:18 AM
[SEALED] STATE COURT RECORD filed by Attorney General of the State of Delaware, Brian Emig. (scs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2020.07.15 - Corr. 26c Appx -33,2020,
Att: 2 2020.07.16 - Amend. Corr. Opening 26c Brief -33,2020,
Att: 3 2024.05.06 - Opening Appx -69,2024,
Att: 4 2024.05.06 - Opening Brief -69,2024,
Att: 5 2024.08.02 - Reply Appx -69,2024,
Att: 6 S2023.01.31 - Amended PCR Appx,
Att: 7 S2023.01.31 - Amended PCR Motion,
Att: 8 S2023.08.07 - PCR Answer Appx -C.Calhoun
Friday, April 25, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials Fri 04/25 9:24 AM
NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: State Court Records on CD/Rom. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Brian L. Arban on behalf of Attorney General of the State of Delaware, Brian Emig (Arban, Brian)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc State Court Record Fri 04/25 9:05 AM
STATE COURT RECORD filed by Attorney General of the State of Delaware, Brian Emig.(Arban, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit REDACTED 1804000397 Dkt.,
Att: 2 Exhibit REDACTED Amend. Corr. Opening 26c Brief -33,2020,
Att: 3 Exhibit REDACTED Corr. 26c Appx -33,2020,
Att: 4 Exhibit 26c Answer Brief -33,2020,
Att: 5 Exhibit 26c Answer Appx -33,2020,
Att: 6 Exhibit Final Order -33,2020,
Att: 7 Exhibit REDACTED Opening Brief -69,2024-,
Att: 8 Exhibit REDACTED Opening Appx 1 -69,2024,
Att: 9 Exhibit REDACTED Opening Appx 2 -69,2024,
Att: 10 Exhibit Answering Brief -69,2024,
Att: 11 Exhibit Answer Appx -69,2024,
Att: 12 Exhibit Reply Brief -69,2024,
Att: 13 Exhibit REDACTED Reply Appx -69,2024,
Att: 14 Exhibit Final Order -69,2024,
Att: 15 Exhibit REDACTED Amend Postconviction Mtn,
Att: 16 Exhibit REDACTED Amend PCR Appx,
Att: 17 Exhibit Postconviction Answer,
Att: 18 Exhibit REDACTED PCR Answer Appx 1,
Att: 19 Exhibit REDACTED PCR Answer Appx 2,
Att: 20 Exhibit Reply to PCR Answer
11 11 answer Response to Habeas Petition Fri 04/25 8:52 AM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Attorney General of the State of Delaware, Brian Emig.(Arban, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/24 10:28 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Attorney General of the State of Delaware, Brian Emig. (Arban, Brian)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Mon 03/24 10:51 AM
SO ORDERED re10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the unopposed motion is GRANTED. Respondents shall file their answer on or before 4/25/2025. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/24/2025. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
order SO ORDERED Fri 02/21 8:51 AM
SO ORDERED re8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Catherine Trama,7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karl Schwartz filed by Chaon Calhoun. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/21/2025. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Thu 02/20 4:46 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Karl Schwartz and Catherine Trama. ( re8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Catherine Trama,7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karl Schwartz )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4619458).(Mondros, Herbert)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/20 4:44 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Catherine Trama - filed by Chaon Calhoun. (Mondros, Herbert)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/20 4:43 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karl Schwartz - filed by Chaon Calhoun. (Mondros, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/13 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Arban on behalf of Attorney General of the State of Delaware, Brian Emig (Arban, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order - 2254 Habeas Respond/Answer - Service Order Tue 02/11 4:27 PM
ORDER TO RESPOND/ANSWER. NOTICE OF SERVICE: The Court has determined that the respondents should respond to the petition. Pursuant to the Memorandum of Understanding on Acceptance of Service between this Court, The Clerk of Court, and the Delaware Department of Justice, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, 28 U.S.C. foll. Section 2254. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/11/2025. (jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 D.I.
Att: 1 - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,
Att: 2 D.I.
Att: 4 - Brief in Support of Petition
utility Remark Tue 02/11 4:29 PM
Remark: Copy of3 [SEALED] APPENDIX has been emailed to defense counsel, per D.I.5 ORDER TO RESPOND/ANSWER (jfm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/05 10:20 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
4 4 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Fri 01/31 8:09 AM
BRIEF in Support of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Chaon Calhoun. (scs)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Appendix Thu 01/30 9:28 AM
[SEALED] APPENDIX re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Chaon Calhoun. (scs)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 01/30 8:55 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (scs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 01/30 8:54 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number ADEDC-4602944)- filed by Chaon Calhoun.(scs)
Related: [-]
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet