Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:25-cv-00398
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) Labor - Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC
Represented By
Lauren House Zeldin
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Atl
contact info
John B. Brown
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Tx
contact info
Defendant
Top Golf USA Inc.
Represented By
Lauren House Zeldin
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Atl
contact info
John B. Brown
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Tx
contact info
Defendant
Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC
Represented By
Lauren House Zeldin
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Atl
contact info
John B. Brown
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Tx
contact info
Plaintiff
Malery Billingy
Represented By
Evan P. Drew
Parks, Chesin & Walbert, P.C.
contact info
Andrew Yancey Coffman
Parks, Chesin & Walbert, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Cameron Marshall
Represented By
Evan P. Drew
Parks, Chesin & Walbert, P.C.
contact info
Andrew Yancey Coffman
Parks, Chesin & Walbert, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Zhania Smith
Represented By
Evan P. Drew
Parks, Chesin & Walbert, P.C.
contact info
Andrew Yancey Coffman
Parks, Chesin & Walbert, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
33 33 order Order Thu 05/08 9:41 AM
ORDER (by docket entry only): On review of the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan [ECF31 ], the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified. Discovery is STAYED pending resolution of Plaintiffs' pending motion for conditional class certification. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 5/8/2025. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/02 4:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally filed by Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC.(Brown, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, April 28, 2025
31 31 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Mon 04/28 5:57 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC. (Brown, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/15 10:52 AM
ORDER (by docket entry only): The parties' consent motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Court-Sponsored Notice to a Conditional Class ECF27 is GRANTED. The new deadline is May 2, 2025. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/15/2025. (dnb)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/15 10:50 AM
ORDER (by docket entry only): The parties' joint motion for extension of time to file joint preliminary report and discovery plan ECF26 is GRANTED. The new deadline is April 28, 2025. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/15/2025. (dnb)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 9:44 AM
ORDER (by docket entry only) granting25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Victoria Vish. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/15/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dnb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 04/15 9:45 AM
Clerk's Certificate of E-Mailing to Victoria Vish re 28 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
27 27 4 pgs motion Extension of Time Mon 04/14 12:48 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Court-Sponsored Notice to a Conditional Class re:22 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally by Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC.(Brown, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
26 26 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/14 12:37 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan by Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC.(Brown, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 04/10 8:53 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:25 APPLICATION for Admission of Victoria Vish Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14205859). Attorney Victoria Vish added appearing on behalf of Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (mh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
25 25 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/09 1:06 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Victoria Vish Pro Hac Vice.by Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC. (Zeldin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Wed 04/09 11:12 AM
RETURN of23 APPLICATION for Admission of Victoria L. Vish Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction. Reason for Return: Applicant must use the courts PHV application. Please correct and resubmit. (esr)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Wed 04/09 11:13 AM
RETURN of24 APPLICATION for Admission of Victoria L. Vish Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14205859) to attorney for correction. Reason for Return: Applicant must use the courts PHV application. Please correct and resubmit. (esr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
24 24 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 12:08 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Victoria L. Vish Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14205859).by Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC.(Zeldin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
23 23 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 11:43 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Victoria L. Vish Pro Hac Vice.by Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC.(Zeldin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
22 22 4 pgs motion Certify Class Fri 04/04 3:11 PM
MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally with Brief In Support by Malery Billingy.(Drew, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Court-Sponsored Notice to a Conditional Class,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Court-Sponsored Notice to a Conditional Class,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2- Proposed Notice of Lawsuit
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
21 21 misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 03/19 9:34 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER (by docket entry only): Clerk's Notation re: ECF20 ; no conflicts identified. Approved by Judge Grimberg. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
20 20 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/17 2:32 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malery Billingy. (Coffman, Andrew)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Mon 03/17 1:37 PM
ORDER (by docket entry only): Clerk's Notation re: ECF18 ; no conflicts identified. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement within 7 days of this Order. Approved by Judge Grimberg. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 03/17/2025. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
18 18 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/14 4:37 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Topgolf International, Inc., Corporate Parent Topgolf Callaway Brands Corp. for Top Golf USA Inc.. (Zeldin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/14 1:21 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC. Discovery ends on 8/11/2025.(Zeldin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Fri 03/14 9:20 AM
RETURN of16 APPLICATION for Admission of Victoria L. Vish Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction. Reason for Return: Payment must be made for the application. Please correct and refile. (esr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
16 16 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 2:30 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Victoria L. Vish Pro Hac Vice.by Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC.(Zeldin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Filing Wed 03/12 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Malery Billingy(Drew, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action of Dylan Brown,
Att: 2 Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action of Madison Riner
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
14 14 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/11 11:54 AM
ORDER granting13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John B. Brown. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 03/11/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dnb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 03/07 9:31 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:13 APPLICATION for Admission of John B. Brown Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14123022). Attorney John B. Brown added appearing on behalf of Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
13 13 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/06 3:06 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of John B. Brown Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14123022).by Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC.(Zeldin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 03, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/03 4:34 PM
ORDER (by docket entry only) : The parties' consent motion for extension of time for Defendants to file answer or otherwise respond to the complaint ECF11 is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. The new deadline is March 14, 2025. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 3/3/2025. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Fri 02/28 3:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC, Top Golf USA Inc., Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC.(Zeldin, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 17, 2025
10 10 service Return of Service Executed Mon 02/17 1:57 PM
Return of Service Executed by Malery Billingy. Top Golf USA Inc. served on 2/7/2025, answer due 2/28/2025. (Drew, Evan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Thu 02/13 3:45 PM
Return of Service Executed by Malery Billingy. Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC served on 2/7/2025, answer due 2/28/2025. (Drew, Evan)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Thu 02/13 3:38 PM
Return of Service Executed by Malery Billingy. Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC served on 2/7/2025, answer due 2/28/2025. (Drew, Evan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 02/06 11:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Top Golf USA Alpharetta, LLC. (tas)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 02/06 11:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Top Golf USA Inc. (tas)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 02/06 11:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Topgolf Payroll Services, LLC. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
4 4 service Proposed Summons Wed 02/05 10:15 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Malery Billingy(Drew, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons of Top Golf Payroll Services, LLC,
Att: 2 Summons of Top Golf USA, Inc.
Friday, January 31, 2025
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Fri 01/31 12:05 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 1/31/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online Fri 01/31 1:33 PM
Clerks Approval re2 Application for Refund of Fees paid online for receipt number AGANDC-14024316. (mec)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
2 2 misc Application for Refund of Fees paid online Thu 01/30 4:17 PM
Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-14024316. (Drew, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/30 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14024643) filed by Richard Cameron Marshall, Malery Billingy, Zhania Smith.(ajw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Consent to be Party Plaintiff by Richard Cameron Marshall,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Consent to be Party Plaintiff by Zhania Simon,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet