Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-04522
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 31, 2025 12:57 AM MST
Defendant
Leonel Salazar-Diaz (1)
Represented By
Jessica Valdez Ruiz
Ruiz Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/31/2025 2:41 AM MST
Monday, January 27, 2025
Arrest of Leonel Salazar-Diaz on 1/27/2025. (JAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Leonel Salazar-Diaz. (JAM)
Related: [-]