Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 1:25-cv-00147
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 4:40 AM CDT
Defendant
Tribe Leasing, LLC
Defendant
Fred McRae Jr.
Plaintiff
William McGough
Represented By
Edward Festeryga
Edward Festeryga PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/08 4:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William McGough as to Fred McRae Jr.. Waiver sent on 5/8/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. (Festeryga, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Fri 04/11 6:08 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by William McGough. (Festeryga, Edward)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Thu 04/10 10:00 AM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tribe Leasing, LLC. (Begley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/18 3:50 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Matthew R. Begley added to party Tribe Leasing, LLC(pty:dft) by Tribe Leasing, LLC.(Begley, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/05 7:12 PM
MOTION for Substitute Service by William McGough.(Festeryga, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Plf's Mtn for Sub Service
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/05 3:40 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 01/31 9:41 AM
Summons Issued as to Fred McRae Jr., Tribe Leasing, LLC. (kp)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/31 9:09 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by William Torin McGough. (Festeryga, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/31 9:08 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by William Torin McGough. (Festeryga, Edward)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/31 9:02 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19732685), filed by William Torin McGough.(Festeryga, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/31 9:39 AM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Fri 01/31 9:40 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Fri 01/31 9:40 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William McGough. (kp)
Related: [-]