Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:Lisa G Wood
Referred: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Case #: 5:25-cv-00009
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 5:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Trey Bennett
Defendant
Wesley Brooks
Defendant
Richard Dunn
Defendant
Georgia Department of Community Affairs (DCA)
Defendant
Governor's Office of Planning and Budget (OPB)
Defendant
Christopher Nunn
Plaintiff
Brigid Cappelletti
Represented By
Jared Bryans Magnuson
Lehotsky Keller Cohn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Chesla
Represented By
Jared Bryans Magnuson
Lehotsky Keller Cohn LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 04/30 9:30 AM
TEXT ORDER granting12 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall file any desired motion for class certification on or before June 29, 2025. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to amend this deadline upon the record and docket of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on April 30, 2025. (edd)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/30 12:14 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion for Class Certification due by 6/29/2025. (thb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
12 12 4 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 04/28 2:28 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Unopposed) Motion for Class Certification by Brigid Cappelletti, Scott Chesla. Responses due by 5/12/2025. (Magnuson, Jared)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 04/28 3:41 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Unopposed) Motion for Class Certification. (csr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 11:48 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott Chesla, Brigid Cappelletti. Governor's Office of Planning and Budget (OPB) waiver sent on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025. (Magnuson, Jared)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 11:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott Chesla, Brigid Cappelletti. Christopher Nunn waiver sent on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025. (Magnuson, Jared)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 11:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott Chesla, Brigid Cappelletti. Richard Dunn waiver sent on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025. (Magnuson, Jared)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 11:44 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott Chesla, Brigid Cappelletti. Georgia Department of Community Affairs (DCA) waiver sent on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025. (Magnuson, Jared)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 11:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott Chesla, Brigid Cappelletti. Wesley Brooks waiver sent on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025. (Magnuson, Jared)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 11:41 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott Chesla, Brigid Cappelletti. Trey Bennett waiver sent on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025. (Magnuson, Jared)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 11:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Trey Bennett, Wesley Brooks, Richard Dunn, Georgia Department of Community Affairs (DCA), Governor's Office of Planning and Budget (OPB), Christopher Nunn. (thb)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Submitted Tue 04/15 10:33 AM
Summons Submitted (Magnuson, Jared)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Fri 01/31 11:31 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Brigid Cappelletti, Scott Chesla. (Magnuson, Jared)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Rule 26(f) Order Fri 01/31 10:10 AM
RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/31/2025. (SLC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/31 10:08 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Scott Chesla and Brigid Cappelletti.. Filing Fee Paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3988143, $405. (SLC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - C