Utah District Court
Judge:David Nuffer
Case #: 4:25-cv-00008
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 3:05 AM MDT
Defendant
Lehi K Afatasi
Defendant
Clinton Anderson
Defendant
Zachary P Banz
Defendant
Timothy Mac Bonzo
Defendant
Nephi Canjas
Defendant
City of Cedar City
Defendant
Brent A. Dunlap
Plaintiff
Alicia Coulter
700 ROUND VALLEY RD STE 115
PARK CITY, UT 84060


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
13 13 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/28 2:09 PM
ORDER temporarily granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By 5/26/25, Plaintiff must cure the Complaint's deficiencies by filing a single document entitled "Amended Complaint" which will then be screened for dismissal or for an order effecting service upon valid defendants. If Plaintiff fails to timely cure the deficiencies according to this Order's instructions, this action may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/28/25 (alt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
12 12 misc Mail Returned Thu 03/20 1:34 PM
Mail resent to Alicia Coulter re docket entries4 ,9 Returned as Undeliverable/Attempted Not Known. Park City address belongs to an advocacy/support organization. Called and they said their address can be used for persons currently using their service, but not by persons not affiliating with them. Unable to reach anyone at the phone number: have updated address and will resend to the address that has appeared as the return address on all of plaintiff's mailings. (alt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
11 11 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 03/18 11:41 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re9 Order to Show Cause, filed by Alicia Coulter (alt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/04 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Location This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's[LINK:Southern Region web page.] (bmr)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 03/04 10:11 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff is to respond in writing within 14 days of this Order to attempt to show cause as to why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the Court's Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 3/4/25 (alt)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Returned Tue 03/04 10:09 AM
Mail sent to Alicia Coulter has all been Returned as Undeliverable/Unable to Forward. Placed a call to the phone number indicated on the complaint and got a call back from an "Ace Coulter" - the name on the envelopes attached to1 Complaint. They put Alicia on the line and she gave a new Park City address. The contact data has been updated and the new order and past order will be sent to the new address. (alt)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
8 8 misc Mail Returned Tue 02/25 8:39 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Alicia Coulter - Document 3 - Attempted - Not Known - Unable to forward. (haa)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Mail Returned Tue 02/25 8:37 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Alicia Coulter - Document4 Attempted - Not know - Unable to forward. (haa)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Mail Returned Tue 02/25 8:32 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Alicia Coulter- Documents1 and2 . Attempted - Not Know -Unable to Forward. (haa)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Reassignment to District Judge Mon 02/24 9:19 AM
NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-3 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge David Nuffer and Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(mh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 02/03 11:11 AM
ORDER temporarily granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must not file any motions or other documents during the time the case is screened or until the court orders otherwise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 2/3/2025. (alf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Fri 01/31 11:52 AM
NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Alicia Coulter. Form due by 2/21/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/31 11:20 AM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Alicia Coulter. (sg)
Related: [-] ceived by the court on: 01/31/2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (Court) Fri 01/31 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT against Lehi K Afatasi, Clinton Anderson, Zachary P Banz, Timothy Mac Bonzo, Nephi Canjas, City of Cedar City, Brent A. Dunlap (Originally received by the court on 01/31/2025). (Fee Status: PENDING IFP) filed by Alicia Coulter. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler (sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope with Complaint,
Att: 3 Envelope with Civil Cover Sheet