Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Case #: 9:25-cv-80145
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 4:50 AM EDT
Cross Claimant
Esther Ros-Naidoo
Represented By
Amy B. Beller
Beller Smith, Pl
contact info
Cross Defendant
Josee Brousseau
Defendant
Josee Brousseau
Represented By
Robert Craig Buschel
Buschel Gibbons, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Esther Ros-Naidoo
Represented By
Amy B. Beller
Beller Smith, Pl
contact info
Plaintiff
The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By
John Edward Meagher
Shutts & Bowen
contact info
Jeffrey Mark Landau
Shutts & Bowen, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
28 28 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 05/02 10:33 AM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
27 27 respm Response/Reply (Other) Thu 05/01 12:58 PM
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO JOSEE BROUSSEAU'S COUNTER-CROSS CLAIM by Esther Ros-Naidoo. (Beller, Amy)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 05/01 10:00 AM
ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 5/18/2026 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge David S. Leibowitz., Calendar Call set for 5/11/2026 02:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge David S. Leibowitz.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/30/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Thu 05/01 9:27 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference is hereby set for May 20, 2025 at 1:00pm via Zoom. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 263 9132 and Passcode: 929006. All participants at the hearing are expected to appear by both audio and video. All parties and their counsel must appear for the settlement conference. An individual with full and complete authority to negotiate and finalize a settlement for each party must be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 5/1/2025. (jb02)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
24 24 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Wed 04/30 11:22 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Esther Ros-Naidoo, Josee Brousseau (Beller, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 12:34 PM
NOTICE Regarding Adverse Claims To Monies Deposited Into The Court's Registry by Esther Ros-Naidoo. (Beller, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
22 22 answer Answer to Crossclaim Mon 04/28 2:48 PM
Brousseau's ANSWER to Crossclaim of Ros-Naidoo , Counter CROSSCLAIM against Esther Ros-Naidoo by Josee Brousseau. Attorney Robert Craig Buschel added to party Josee Brousseau(pty:crd). (Buschel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
21 21 minutes Settlement Conference + MINUTE ORDER (IMPORTANT! select w hrg(s) for AO CREDIT) Wed 04/23 3:38 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe: Settlement Conference held on 4/23/2025. Total time in court: 2 hour(s) : 11 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Amy B. Beller, Lindsay Adler, Robert Craig Buschel. (Digital Zoom Video Start Time: 1:00 pm). Good faith settlement negotiations were held. The settlement conference is adjourned to allow the parties to coordinate with other involved individuals in order to facilitate a global resolution. The parties shall file a joint motion proposing three mutually agreed upon dates to reconvene the settlement conference within the next 30 days at 1:00 PM via Zoom. All court ordered deadlines remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 4/23/2025. (jb02)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
20 20 misc Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee) Wed 03/26 8:20 AM
Clerks Receipt for Treasury Registry Deposit received on 3/25/2025 in the amount of $ 2,077,874.84, receipt number 9430. (pcs)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Compliance Tue 03/25 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Compliance With Court Order by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company re14 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds (Landau, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
18 18 3 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Mon 03/24 2:57 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM Settlement Conference set for 4/23/2025 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 3/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion for Appointment of Mediator Mon 03/24 10:23 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting15 Joint Request for Settlement Conference. The Court will set the settlement conference by separate Order to take place on April 23, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 3/24/2025. (jb02)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order Referring Motion Fri 03/21 10:05 AM
AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe for a Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 3/20/2025. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
15 15 motion Appoint Mediator Wed 03/19 5:06 PM
Joint MOTION to Appoint Mediator Magistrate Judge Ryon McCabe by Josee Brousseau. Responses due by 4/2/2025. (Buschel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
14 14 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Deposit Funds Mon 03/17 10:25 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part4 Motion for Interpleader and to Deposit Funds into Court Registry and Discharge. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 3/14/2025. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Fri 03/14 5:30 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Esther Ros-Naidoo (Beller, Amy)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Initial Disclosure(s) Fri 03/14 5:24 PM
Initial Disclosure(s) by Esther Ros-Naidoo (Beller, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
11 11 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 03/11 2:12 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re10 Order to Show Cause, by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Landau, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 03/04 1:27 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff shall file a Local Rule 7.1(a)(3) certification no later than March 12, 2025. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 3/4/2025. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/03 8:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Josee Brousseau. (Buschel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 02/26 3:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Josee Brousseau. Josee Brousseau waiver sent on 2/26/2025, response/answer due 4/28/2025. (Beller, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 02/25 5:41 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Craig Buschel on behalf of Josee Brousseau. Attorney Robert Craig Buschel added to party Josee Brousseau(pty:dft). (Buschel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Fri 02/21 10:28 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Josee Brousseau by Esther Ros-Naidoo. (Beller, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/05 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy B. Beller on behalf of Esther Ros-Naidoo. Attorney Amy B. Beller added to party Esther Ros-Naidoo(pty:dft). (Beller, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
4 4 motion Deposit Funds Fri 01/31 4:19 PM
MOTION to Deposit Funds into Court Registry for Interpleader and Discharge by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Landau, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 01/31 3:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Josee Brousseau, Esther Ros-Naidoo. (ar24)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 01/31 3:35 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Interpleader Complaint Fri 01/31 12:20 PM
Interpleader Complaint Filing fee $405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18168531, filed by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Meagher, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summon(s) Josee Brousseau,
Att: 5 Summon(s) Esther Ros-Naidoo