New York Southern District Court
Judge:Denise L Cote
Case #: 1:25-cv-00935
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Les Funtleyder
Defendant
Stacy J. Kanter
Defendant
Teena Lerner
Defendant
Joel S. Marcus
Defendant
Riccardo Perfetti
Defendant
Shoshana Shendelman
Defendant
Jay S. Skyler
Nominal Defendant
Applied Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By
Michael G. Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Ripley Shiarella
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Younes Hassine
Represented By
Timothy William Brown
The Brown Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
21 21 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Case Stayed ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/05 3:36 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TEMPORARILY STAY ACTION AND ADJOURN THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, subject to the Court's approval, as follows: 1. All proceedings in the Derivative Proceeding, including but not limited to Defendants' obligation to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, are temporarily stayed, subject to the conditions discussed herein. 2. The Derivative Proceeding, including all deadlines and conferences, shall be stayed until the earlier of either of the following events: (i) the Securities Actions are dismissed with prejudice; or (ii) the close of fact discovery in the Securities Actions. 3. While this Derivative Proceeding is stayed, the Company shall promptly notify Plaintiff, through their undersigned counsel, of any derivative action(s) based on the same or similar set of facts as those alleged in this Derivative Proceeding. As further set forth by this Order. A status letter shall be due 3/13/26. Case stayed. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/5/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
20 20 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 03/04 9:06 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Applied Therapeutics, Inc...(Bongiorno, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
19 19 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/03 10:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Shoshana Shendelman waiver sent on 2/24/2025, answer due 4/25/2025. Document filed by Younes Hassine..(Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/03 10:52 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Stacy J. Kanter waiver sent on 2/24/2025, answer due 4/25/2025. Document filed by Younes Hassine..(Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/03 10:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jay S. Skyler waiver sent on 2/24/2025, answer due 4/25/2025. Document filed by Younes Hassine..(Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/03 10:50 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Joel S. Marcus waiver sent on 2/24/2025, answer due 4/25/2025. Document filed by Younes Hassine..(Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/03 10:49 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Teena Lerner waiver sent on 2/24/2025, answer due 4/25/2025. Document filed by Younes Hassine..(Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/03 10:48 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Riccardo Perfetti waiver sent on 2/24/2025, answer due 4/25/2025. Document filed by Younes Hassine..(Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/03 10:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Les Funtleyder waiver sent on 2/24/2025, answer due 4/25/2025. Document filed by Younes Hassine..(Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/25 10:54 AM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Granted. Applied Therapeutics, Inc. answer due 3/10/2025. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/25/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/24 9:58 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael G. Bongiorno dated February 24, 2025. Document filed by Applied Therapeutics, Inc...(Bongiorno, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 9:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ripley Shiarella on behalf of Applied Therapeutics, Inc...(Shiarella, Ripley)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 9:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans on behalf of Applied Therapeutics, Inc...(Kaplan-Marans, Tamar)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 9:41 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael G. Bongiorno on behalf of Applied Therapeutics, Inc...(Bongiorno, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 02/05 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/7/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/5/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
utility Case Accepted as Related Tue 02/04 4:16 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:24-cv-09715-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Tue 02/04 4:18 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(tro)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 02/04 4:18 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/03 1:58 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Applied Therapeutics, Inc. served on 2/3/2025, answer due 2/24/2025. Service was accepted by Pam LaRosa, Registered Agent. Document filed by Younes Hassine..(Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 02/03 10:24 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Applied Therapeutics, Inc., Les Funtleyder, Stacy J. Kanter, Teena Lerner, Joel S. Marcus, Riccardo Perfetti, Shoshana Shendelman, Jay S. Skyler. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 02/03 10:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Timothy William Brown. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Younes Hassine. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 02/03 10:21 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 02/03 10:21 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Mon 02/03 10:21 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Denise L. Cote as possibly related to 1:24-cv-09715-DLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/31 3:56 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Applied Therapeutics, Inc., Shoshana Shendelman, Riccardo Perfetti, Les Funtleyder, Stacy J. Kanter, Teena Lerner, Joel S. Marcus, and Jay S. Skyler, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Younes Hassine..(Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Relatedness Fri 01/31 3:53 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:24-cv-09715. Document filed by Younes Hassine..(Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/31 3:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 76 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/31 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Applied Therapeutics, Inc., Les Funtleyder, Stacy J. Kanter, Teena Lerner, Joel S. Marcus, Riccardo Perfetti, Shoshana Shendelman, Jay S. Skyler. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30548198)Document filed by Younes Hassine..(Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]