Vermont District Court
Judge:Kevin J Doyle
Case #: 2:25-cv-00135
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Matthew A. Ferrigno, Esq.
Paul Frank + Collins PC
contact info
Defendant
Verisk
Plaintiff
Gaetan Brochu
Represented By
Christopher J. McVeigh, Esq.
Mcveigh Skiff
contact info

GPO Mar 05 2025
ORDER: Plaintiff shall return his executed Local Rule 73 form on or before 3/12/2025. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 3/5/2025. (cdc)
GPO Apr 17 2025
ORDER: Defendents shall return their executed Local Rule 73 form on or before 4/25/2025. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 4/17/2025. (cdc)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 05/06 11:56 AM
ORDER granting20 JOINT MOTION to Stay all proceedings in this case for 60 days. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 5/6/2025. (cdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
20 20 motion Stay Mon 05/05 3:34 PM
JOINT MOTION to Stay all proceedings in this case for 60 days filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Ferrigno, Matthew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/5/2025) (cdc). Attachment description modified on 5/5/2025 (cdc). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/5/2025) (cdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
19 19 misc Consent to Direct Assignment Tue 04/22 4:16 PM
CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Verisk (O'Brien, Evan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
18 18 misc Consent to Direct Assignment Fri 04/18 1:24 PM
CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Ferrigno, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
17 17 order ~Util - Set Deadlines Order Thu 04/17 10:41 AM
ORDER: Defendents shall return their executed Local Rule 73 form on or before 4/25/2025. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 4/17/2025. (cdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/09 11:43 AM
ORDER granting15 SECOND STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer due 5/7/2025. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 4/9/2025. (This is a text-only Order.) (cdc) Text modified on 4/9/2025 (cdc)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/09 11:20 AM
SECOND STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Ferrigno, Matthew) Text modified on 4/9/2025 (cdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/07 8:40 AM
ORDER granting13 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer due 5/7/2025. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 4/6/2025. (This is a text-only Order.) (cdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/04 12:52 PM
ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Verisk (O'Brien, Evan)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Fri 04/04 9:30 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Gaetan Brochu. Answer due 4/7/2025. (cdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
11 11 service Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed Wed 03/26 3:47 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Verisk served on 3/17/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (cdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
10 10 misc Consent to Direct Assignment Wed 03/12 10:44 AM
CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Gaetan Brochu. (cdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/05 3:34 PM
ORDER granting8 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 3/5/2025. (This is a text-only Order.) (cdc)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 03/05 3:00 PM
STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Ferrigno, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/05 2:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew A. Ferrigno, Esq on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Ferrigno, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/05 10:31 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff shall return his executed Local Rule 73 form on or before 3/12/2025. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 3/5/2025. (cdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
5 5 service Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed Tue 02/25 12:44 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 2/18/2025, answer due 3/11/2025. (cdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
4 4 utility Notice of Docket Entry Correction Mon 02/03 9:04 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:1 Complaint: Demand for Jury Trial removed and entered on its own for3 . (cdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
3 3 misc Jury Demand Fri 01/31 4:53 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gaetan Brochu. (cdc)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 01/31 4:51 PM
ISSUED Summons as to All Defendants. (cdc)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/31 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gaetan Brochu. (cdc) Document removed on 1/31/2025 (cdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility LR 73 Forms Issued Fri 01/31 4:50 PM
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF re: Issuance of Local Rule 73 Forms. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Kevin Doyle. Pursuant to Local Rule 73, this case has been assigned to the Magistrate Judge for all purposes, including trial and final entry of judgment. It is the responsibility of the plaintiff to serve the required Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Magistrate Judge Assignment Form on all other parties that are served under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and 5. The notice and form can be accessed[LINK:here] . Whether consenting or objecting to the assignment, the Magistrate Judge Assignment Form must be filed by each party within 21 days after receiving the notice. (cdc)
Related: [-]