California Central District Court
Judge:Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:25-cv-00863
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 18, 2025 3:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Pebj Properties, LLC
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Clifton Walker
Represented By
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
18 18 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 04/30 10:19 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))14 , filed on April 28, 2025, the case is hereby CLOSED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Wed 04/30 10:14 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))15 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The document is stricken. (afe)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 04/30 10:12 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filing is a duplicative of ECF no.14 In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (afe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
15 15 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 04/29 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
14 14 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 04/28 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
13 13 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 03/31 1:28 PM
ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The Court has reviewed the Notice of Settlement filed on March 28, 202512 . The Court orders that the parties file a Stipulation for Dismissal of the action by no later than April 28, 2025. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Settlement Fri 03/28 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
11 11 textonly MJDAP Opt-Out Expired Tue 03/18 6:50 AM
The period to decline consent to a magistrate judge has expired. No timely declination of consent has been received by the Court. Each party is deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes pursuant to the Local Rules. The case shall now proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 03/04 11:56 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Clifton Walker, upon Defendant Pebj Properties, LLC served on 2/28/2025, answer due 3/21/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon BLAINE J. BURCH, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
9 9 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Fri 02/07 11:57 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (afe)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 02/03 9:40 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)6 as to Defendant Pebj Properties, LLC. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Mon 02/03 9:35 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
6 6 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 01/31 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($405 paid on 01/31/2025, receipt number 39021815).(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Errata Fri 01/31 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Clifton Walker. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 01/31 2:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 01/31 2:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 01/31 2:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 01/31 2:03 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39021815 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Clifton Walker(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]