Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Michael P Mills
Referred: Roy Percy
Case #: 1:25-cv-00015
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 5:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Piggly Wiggly of Amory, Inc.
Plaintiff
State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Scott Timothy Ellzey
Phelps Dunbar
contact info
Drury Sumner Holland
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 14, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/14 8:44 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Holland, Drury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Thu 02/27 10:02 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Piggly Wiggly of Amory, Inc. (zdg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Wed 02/05 8:20 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/4/2025. (rcm)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/04 3:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company Piggly Wiggly of Amory, Inc. served on 2/4/2025. (Holland, Drury)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 02/04 9:37 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Debra M. Brown recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Sharion Aycock for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 2/4/2025. (jla)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 01/31 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Piggly Wiggly of Amory, Inc.. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/31 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMSNDC-2487502, filed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (jla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Umpire Resumes,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Fri 01/31 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
Related: [-]