New Mexico District Court
Judge:Judith C Herrera
Referred: Steven C Yarbrough
Case #: 1:25-cv-00108
Nature of Suit355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 3:01 AM MDT
Defendant
CRA Trailers, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb
contact info
Defendant
Great Dane LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb
contact info
Defendant
Great Dane Limited Partnership
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb
contact info
Defendant
Great Dane Trailers
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb
contact info
Defendant
Thermo King Fresno, Inc.
Plaintiff
Andras Szantho
Represented By
Aimee S. Bevan
Hunt Law Firm
contact info
Reed Colfax
Relman, Dane & Colfax PLLC
contact info
Lee R Hunt
contact info

GPO Mar 03 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to file Rule 7.1 disclosure statements by 03/17/2025. (cm)
GPO Apr 01 2025
ORDER TO AMEND CITIZENSHIP DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
GPO Apr 29 2025
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting 20 Motion to Seal Document (kfo)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
30 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Emahunn Campbell on behalf of Andras Szantho (Campbell, Emahunn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
29 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great Dane LLC Initial Disclosures (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
27 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thermo King Fresno, Inc. Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Winston, Moses)
Related: [-]
26 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andras Szantho Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Colfax, Reed)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting20 Motion to Seal Document (kfo)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
24 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thermo King Fresno, Inc. (Winston, Moses)
Related: [-]
23 23 ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Thermo King Fresno, Inc.. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by Andras Szantho.(Winston, Moses)
Related: [-]
22 22 Joint Status Report by Andras Szantho (Colfax, Reed)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
20 20 MOTION to Seal Document Stipulated Motion to File Portions of its Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement Under Seal by Great Dane LLC. (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, April 11, 2025
19 19 NOTICE by Thermo King Fresno, Inc. of Agreed Upon Extension of Time (Winston, Moses)
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Moses B. Winston, V on behalf of Thermo King Fresno, Inc. (Winston, Moses)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
17 17 3 pgs ORDER TO AMEND CITIZENSHIP DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 14. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
REFUSAL TO CONSENT to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (Colfax, Reed)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
13 13 2 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 4/25/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2025 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/8/2025. (kfo)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
12 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Andras Szantho (Colfax, Reed)
Related: [-]
11 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Dane LLC identifying Corporate Parent Great Dane Trailers, Inc. for Great Dane LLC. (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
10 10 3 pgs MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to file Rule 7.1 disclosure statements by 03/17/2025. (cm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
9 9 Great Dane, LLC ANSWER to1 Complaint, for Wrongful Death, Negligence, Strict Product Liability, Breach of Implied Warranty and Punitive Damages by Great Dane LLC. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by Andras Szantho.(Croasdell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Andras Szantho as to Great Dane Limited Partnership. (Colfax, Reed)
Related: [-]
7 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andras Szantho. Thermo King Fresno, Inc. served on 2/20/2025, answer due 3/13/2025. (Colfax, Reed)
Related: [-]
6 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andras Szantho. CRA Trailers, Inc. served on 2/6/2025, answer due 2/27/2025. (Colfax, Reed)
Related: [-]
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andras Szantho. Great Dane Trailers served on 2/6/2025, answer due 2/27/2025. (Colfax, Reed)
Related: [-]
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andras Szantho. Great Dane LLC served on 2/6/2025, answer due 2/27/2025. (Colfax, Reed)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9759784 re1 Complaint, filed by Andras Szantho (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Colfax, Reed)
Related: [-]
United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
Related: [-]
Summons Issued as to CRA Trailers, Inc., Great Dane LLC, Great Dane Limited Partnership, Great Dane Trailers, Thermo King Fresno, Inc.. (dr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Reed Colfax on behalf of Andras Szantho (Colfax, Reed)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against CRA Trailers, Inc., Great Dane LLC, Great Dane Limited Partnership, Great Dane Trailers, Thermo King Fresno, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Andras Szantho.(Colfax, Reed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons to Great Dane LLC,
Att: 3 Summons to Great Dane Limited Partnership,
Att: 4 Summons to Great Dane Trailers,
Att: 5 Summons to CRA Trailers, Inc.,
Att: 6 Summons to Thermo King Fresno, Inc.