Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:25-bk-30372
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Dismissed:Mar 17, 2025
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Honducrete Redi Mix Inc.
9330 Lyndon B Johnson Fwy Ste 900
Dallas, TX 75243-3443
Represented By
Robert Thomas DeMarco
Robert Demarco
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
court Close bankruptcy case Wed 04/09 4:24 PM
Bankruptcy case closed. (Wright Jr., Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
court Hearing not held Fri 03/28 2:02 PM
Hearing NOT held on 3/27/2025. Related [+]
Related: [-] 20 Motion to dismiss case United States Trustees Emergency Motion to Dismiss under 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b) (NOTE* Case was dismissed on 3 17-2025 prior to hearing). (Edmond, Michael
Friday, March 21, 2025
34 34 order Discharging subchapter V trustee Fri 03/21 3:04 PM
Order discharging subchapter V trustee in a chapter 11 case. Entered on 3/21/2025 (Wright Jr., Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
33 33 trustee Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution C-case dism or conv, fee award not recd Thu 03/20 8:21 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 2 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $1353906.77, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. (Holder, Areya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
32 32 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Wed 03/19 11:18 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 18. Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Order granting motion to dismiss Debtor by U.S. Trustee without prejudice (related document20 ) Entered on 3/17/2025.
Monday, March 17, 2025
31 31 order Dismiss case by U.S. Trustee Mon 03/17 8:56 AM
Order granting motion to dismiss Debtor by U.S. Trustee without prejudice Related [+] Entered on 3/17/2025. (Rielly, Bill)
Related: [-] 20
Saturday, March 15, 2025
30 30 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sat 03/15 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/15/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order granting application to employ DeMarco-Mitchell, PLLC as Attorney (related document9 ) Entered on 3/13/2025.
Thursday, March 13, 2025
29 29 order Employ Thu 03/13 3:37 PM
Order granting application to employ DeMarco-Mitchell, PLLC as Attorney Related [+] Entered on 3/13/2025. (Tello, Chris)
Related: [-] 9
28 28 court Hearing held Thu 03/13 12:28 PM
Hearing held on 3/13/2025. Related [+]
Related: [-] 20 Motion to dismiss case United States Trustees Emergency Motion to Dismiss under 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b)(i), (Appearances: L. Young, for UST; R. Demarco for Debtor; A. Aurzada, subchapter V Trustee; C. Corrigan for Big Town. Evidentiary hearing. Motion granted for reasons stated orally. Ms. Young to upload order.) (Edmond, Michael
27 27 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Thu 03/13 9:28 AM
Amended Witness and Exhibit List filed by Debtor Honducrete Redi Mix Inc. Related [+]. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-] 26 List (witness/exhibit/generic)
Att: 1 Exhibit EXA - INSURANCE - PROPERTY
Att: 2 Exhibit EXB - INSURANCE LIABILITY
Att: 3 Exhibit EXC INSURANCE SUMMARY
Att: 4 Exhibit EXD CERTIFICATE OF INSURANCE
Att: 5 Exhibit EXE - LEASE AGREEMENT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
26 26 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Wed 03/12 10:18 PM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Debtor Honducrete Redi Mix Inc. Related [+]. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-] 20 Motion to dismiss case United States Trustees Emergency Motion to Dismiss under 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b)
Att: 1 Exhibit ExA Evidence of Insurance - Property
Att: 2 Exhibit ExB Evidence of Insurance - Liability
Att: 3 Exhibit ExC - Summary of Insurance
Monday, March 10, 2025
25 25 misc Certificate of no objection Mon 03/10 10:54 PM
Certificate of no objection filed by Debtor Honducrete Redi Mix Inc. Related [+]. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-] 9 Application to employ DeMarco Mitchell, PLLC as Attorney
24 24 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Mon 03/10 11:22 AM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee Related [+]. (Young, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 20 Motion to dismiss case United States Trustees Emergency Motion to Dismiss under 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b)
Att: 1 Exhibit UST-1
Att: 2 Exhibit UST-2
Att: 3 Exhibit UST-3
Att: 4 Exhibit UST-4
Att: 5 Exhibit UST-5
Friday, March 07, 2025
23 23 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 03/07 11:20 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 03/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Motion to dismiss case United States Trustees Emergency Motion to Dismiss under 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b)
Thursday, March 06, 2025
trustee Meeting of creditors continued/adjourned Thu 03/06 10:41 AM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Debtor to serve notice of continued meeting on creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/26/2025 at 01:30 PM by TELEPHONE. (Kippes, Meredyth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of hearing Wed 03/05 8:28 AM
Notice of hearing filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 3/13/2025 at 09:30 AM Dallas Judge Jernigan Ctrm for20 , (Young, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 20 Motion to dismiss case United States Trustees Emergency Motion to Dismiss under 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b)
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
21 21 motion Expedite hearing Tue 03/04 12:09 PM
Motion for expedited hearin Related [+] Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (Young, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 20 Motion to dismiss case by U.S. Trustee
20 20 motion Dismiss case by U.S. Trustee Tue 03/04 12:05 PM
Motion to dismiss case United States Trustees Emergency Motion to Dismiss under 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b) (Young, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
court Notice of approval of expedited hearing request Tue 03/04 12:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPROVAL OF MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING. The motion for expedited hearing has been GRANTED by the court. Counsel for movant shall promptly file and serve a notice of hearing in ECF. Related [+] (Ellison, Traci)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents20 Motion to dismiss case by U.S. Trustee) Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee
Thursday, February 20, 2025
19 19 misc Certificate (generic) Thu 02/20 12:04 PM
Certificate Commencement of Case filed by Debtor Honducrete Redi Mix Inc. Related [+]. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-] 10 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11
Thursday, February 13, 2025
18 18 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Thu 02/13 11:25 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/6/2025 at 10:30 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 4/11/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/30/2025.
17 17 misc Statement of operations Thu 02/13 2:35 PM
Statement of operations for small business. Filed by Debtor Honducrete Redi Mix Inc.. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Balance sheet Thu 02/13 2:35 PM
Balance sheet. Filed by Debtor Honducrete Redi Mix Inc.. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Cash flow statement Thu 02/13 2:34 PM
Cash flow statement for small business. Filed by Debtor Honducrete Redi Mix Inc.. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 02/12 12:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Aaron Capps filed by Creditor Big Town Concrete, LLC. (Capps, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
12 12 misc Schedules Mon 02/10 8:13 PM
Schedules: Schedules A-B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor Honducrete Redi Mix Inc. Related [+]. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
11 11 misc Statement of financial affairs Mon 02/10 8:12 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Honducrete Redi Mix Inc. Related [+]. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
10 10 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Mon 02/10 12:41 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/6/2025 at 10:30 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 4/11/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/30/2025. (Nixon, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 09, 2025
9 9 15 pgs motion Employ Sun 02/09 5:13 PM
Application to employ DeMarco Mitchell, PLLC as Attorney Filed by Debtor Honducrete Redi Mix Inc. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 misc Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor Sun 02/09 4:55 PM
Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor . Filed by Debtor Honducrete Redi Mix Inc.. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
7 7 court BNC certificate of mailing Thu 02/06 11:26 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 2/14/2025. Schedule D due 2/14/2025. Schedule E/F due 2/14/2025. Schedule G due 2/14/2025. Schedule H due 2/14/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 2/14/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 2/14/2025. (Noble, N.)
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
6 6 order Scheduling Order regarding SubChapter V Case Wed 02/05 2:09 PM
Scheduling Order regarding SubChapter V Case Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 3/27/2025 at 02:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/jerniga. Pre-Status Report Due By 3/13/2025. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 5/1/2025. Entered on 2/5/2025 (Ellison, Traci)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary petition (chapter 11) filed by Debtor Honducrete Redi Mix Inc.
5 5 5 pgs trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Wed 02/05 8:26 AM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee . Areya Holder Aurzada (SBRA V) added to the case. (Young, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
4 4 court Notice of deficiency Tue 02/04 2:54 PM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 2/14/2025. Schedule D due 2/14/2025. Schedule E/F due 2/14/2025. Schedule G due 2/14/2025. Schedule H due 2/14/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 2/14/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 2/14/2025. (Noble, N.)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Tue 02/04 2:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John Kendrick Turner filed by Creditor Dallas County. (Turner, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Fri 01/31 7:24 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Small Business,SubChapter V Filed by Honducrete Redi Mix Inc. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 05/1/2025. (DeMarco, Robert)
Related: [-]