South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-00346
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 4:57 AM EST
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
Kidde PLC
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corp
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Plaintiff
Jeremy Clayton
Represented By
Michael Hochman
The Hochman Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, January 31, 2025
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 01/31 2:26 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 1/17/2025), Jeremy Clayton v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-00346-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern District of Indiana (jbin)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 01/31 2:26 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
1 1 41 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/31 2:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12214461.), filed by Jeremy Clayton. Service due by 4/17/2025 (jbin)
Related: [-]