Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Sara Darrow
Referred: Ronald L Hanna
Case #: 4:25-cv-04033
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 3:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Hobby Lobby Stores Inc
Represented By
Martha L Shaff
Betty Neuman & Mcmahon, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lanny Herron
Represented By
Nathan Charles Volheim
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.
contact info
Mally Louise Slone
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
order Order Assigning Referral Judge Thu 04/24 4:23 PM
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/07 8:51 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 6/6/2025. (ED)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 03/06 11:14 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on March 6, 2025. The parties filed a7 Joint Motion for Stay of Action Pending Arbitration, indicating that Plaintiff and Defendant entered into a contract on February 27, 2021, wherein the parties agreed to binding arbitration as the "sole and exclusive means to resolve all disputes" related to Plaintiff's employment. [7-1] Mut. Arb. Agreement para. 1,7 Joint Mot. Ex. 1. The1 Complaint alleges violations of the Americans with Disabilities Act, 42 U.S.C. 12101-12213, and the Family and Medical Leave Act, 29 U.S.C. 2601-2654, and both of these statutes are covered by the Mutual Arbitration Agreement. See7 id. para. 2 & n.2. The Court is satisfied that this case is referable to arbitration under the terms of the contract, see 9 U.S.C. 3, and therefore GRANTS the7 Joint Motion for Stay of Action Pending Arbitration. This case is STAYED. The parties are DIRECTED to file a status report by June 6, 2025. (ARR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
7 7 motion Stay Wed 03/05 9:01 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Action Pending Arbitration by Defendant Hobby Lobby Stores Inc. Responses due by 3/19/2025(Shaff, Martha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, March 03, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Mon 03/03 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Martha L Shaff on behalf of Hobby Lobby Stores Inc (Shaff, Martha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Tue 02/18 8:34 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lanny Herron. Hobby Lobby Stores Inc served on 2/14/2025, answer due 3/7/2025. (Volheim, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 02/11 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mally Louise Slone on behalf of Lanny Herron (Slone, Mally)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 02/11 10:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Hobby Lobby Stores Inc. Original sent to Attorney for Plaintiff for Service. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Fri 01/31 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nathan Charles Volheim on behalf of Lanny Herron (Volheim, Nathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Attorney Complaint Fri 01/31 6:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4661051.), filed by Lanny Herron.(Volheim, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B