Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:25-cv-00094
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2025
Terminated:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 3:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Sony Electronic Inc.
Represented By
Gregory S Gewirtz
Lerner David LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Volteon LLC
104 E. Houston Street
Marshall, TX 75670
Represented By
Isaac Phillip Rabicoff
Rabicoff Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
17 17 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 04/17 1:39 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (KLC)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 04/17 1:37 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE (Motion(s)14 terminated). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/16/2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 04/16 8:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Volteon LLC(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
14 14 motion Stay Tue 04/15 4:09 PM
JOINT MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Sony Electronic Inc..(Gewirtz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing/Deadline Wed 04/09 12:02 PM
ORDER Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2025 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/8/25. (bga)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/21 4:33 PM
ORDER granting11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Defendant Sony Electronics Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) Sony Electronic Inc. answer due 4/17/2025. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/14 11:43 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Defendant Sony Electronics Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) by Sony Electronic Inc..(Gewirtz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 02/14 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory S Gewirtz on behalf of Sony Electronic Inc. (Gewirtz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 02/03 10:32 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Electronic Inc.. (NKL)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 02/03 9:41 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 02/03 9:39 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Volteon LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 02/03 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of Volteon LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 02/03 9:31 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:1 Complaint,. Complaint for Patent Infringement .(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/03 8:12 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (NKL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 02/03 8:12 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 01/31 7:51 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 01/31 7:50 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Volteon LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 01/31 7:49 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of Volteon LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/31 7:23 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Sony Electronic Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10653498.), filed by Volteon LLC.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet