Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam A Lindsay
Referred: Brian Mckay
Case #: 3:25-cv-00245
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 6:54 AM CDT
Defendant
Laura Hughes
Defendant
Kaufman County Texas
Defendant
Stephen Joseph Russell
Represented By
S Cass Weiland
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Micheala Nicole Abor
2118 Devonblue Drive
Forney, TX 75126


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
12 12 respm Reply Tue 03/18 10:46 AM
REPLY filed by Stephen Joseph Russell re:8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support (Weiland, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
10 10 respm Response/Objection Mon 03/10 10:46 AM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Micheala Nicole Abor re:8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) . (axm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
11 11 misc Remark Mon 03/10 2:21 PM
The Clerk declines to enter default re:9 as service does not appear to comply with the elements of FRCP 4(c)(2). (kaf)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Remark Fri 03/07 1:13 PM
The Clerk declines to enter default as service does not appear to comply with the elements of FRCP 4(c)(2). (kaf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
8 8 motion Dismiss Fri 02/14 8:52 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support filed by Stephen Joseph Russell with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney S Cass Weiland added to party Stephen Joseph Russell(pty:dft) (Weiland, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
7 7 misc Affidavit Tue 02/11 11:16 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Micheala Nicole Abor. (ykp)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Affidavit Tue 02/11 11:14 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Micheala Nicole Abor. (ykp)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Affidavit Tue 02/11 11:08 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Micheala Nicole Abor. (ykp)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Affidavit Tue 02/11 11:06 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service/Exhibits A-G re:3 Complaint by Micheala Nicole Abor. (ykp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
3 3 cmp Complaint Fri 01/31 8:46 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Laura Hughes, Kaufman County Texas, Stephen Joseph Russell filed by Micheala Nicole Abor. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number 300016045) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (agc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Fri 01/31 8:44 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (agc)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Lindsay Fri 01/31 8:43 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge McKay (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge McKay). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)
Related: [-]