California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-70006
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 11:15 PM PST
Defendant
Lacie Pura (1)
Represented By
Taylor R. Fatherree
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kevin James Barry
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/01/2025 11:27 PM PST
Friday, January 03, 2025
1 1 Notice of Proceedings on Out-of-District Criminal Charges Pursuant to Rules 5(c)(2) and (3) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure as to Lacie Pura (1). (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Initial Appearance as to Lacie Pura held on 1/3/2025. The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. , Added attorney Taylor R. Fatherree for Lacie Pura. Government seeks to unseal the F12. - Granted by Court. Case #: 2:22-cr-00203-1 (E.D. of Wisconsin). DPPA; Advised.Defendant waives identity hearing/5.1. Proffers heard re. detention/removal. Court orders Probation to interview proposedcustodian. Parties to return to discuss detention/potential release plan to self-report to W.I. 1/9/2025. Detention Hearing set for 1/9/2025 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Recording Time 10:40am-11:03am. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Lacie Pura (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER of Rule 5 Hearings by Lacie Pura (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]