Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00061
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2025
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 1:23 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Shuhao Wang
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Manuel Hernandez-Guerrero (1)
Terminated: 01/23/2025
Represented By
Victor M. Serrano
Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/02/2025 1:40 AM CST
Thursday, January 02, 2025
Arrest of Manuel Hernandez-Guerrero (ll)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Manuel Hernandez-Guerrero by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to Manuel Hernandez-Guerrero. (ll)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Manuel Hernandez-Guerrero. (ll)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING Victor M. Serrano as COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Initial Appearance as to Manuel Hernandez-Guerrero held on 1/3/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (T. Saenz) as to Manuel Hernandez-Guerrero (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Manuel Hernandez-Guerrero, (Detention Hearing set for 1/8/2025 09:00 AM in El Paso before Judge Miguel A. Torres, Preliminary Hearing set for 1/8/2025 09:00 AM in El Paso before Judge Miguel A. Torres), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Manuel Hernandez-Guerrero. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll)
Related: [-]