Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:25-cv-00111
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 18, 2025 3:31 AM CDT
Defendant
BOXX Technologies LLC
Plaintiff
InnoMemory, LLC
Represented By
Isaac Phillip Rabicoff
Rabicoff Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 02/03 9:13 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to BOXX Technologies LLC. (KLC)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/03 9:03 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (NKL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 02/03 9:04 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 01, 2025
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Sat 02/01 10:29 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Sat 02/01 10:26 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by InnoMemory, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Sat 02/01 10:25 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of InnoMemory, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 02/01 10:24 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against BOXX Technologies LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10653755.), filed by InnoMemory, LLC.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet