California Central District Court
Judge:Serena R Murillo
Referred: Michael B Kaufman
Case #: 2:25-cv-00756
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/09 4:40 PM
ORDER RE: RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Michael B. Kaufman, re MOTION to Dismiss9 . Plaintiff has filed only a case management statement that is nonresponsive to the issues raised in the government's motion to dismiss. Dkt. 14. In the interests of justice, the Court will give Plaintiff one more opportunity to respond to the government's motion. Petitioner's response to the motion will be due by or before June 7, 2025. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
14 14 4 pgs misc Statement Tue 04/01 1:29 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Petitioner Richard Verret (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/18 2:36 PM
ORDER RE: RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Michael B. Kaufman, re MOTION to Dismiss9 . Petitioner'sresponse to the motion will be due by or before April 14, 2025. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (hr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
12 12 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 03/14 11:27 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Respondent Warden, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss § 2241 Petition 9 served on March 14, 2025. (Lecedre, Johnpaul)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
11 11 3 pgs order Order Mon 03/03 12:40 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Serena R. Murillo. Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
10 10 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Thu 02/27 6:55 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#25-059) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Serena R. Murillo, this case is transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge Serena R. Murillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-00756 SRM(E). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
9 9 8 pgs motion Dismiss (cause or other) Tue 02/25 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss § 2241 Petition filed by respondent Warden. (Lecedre, Johnpaul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Chris Liwag,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7
Monday, February 24, 2025
8 8 cs_rasgn Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent) Tue 02/25 11:50 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 25-008 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF THE CALENDAR of Magistrate Judge Michael B. Kaufman, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Michael B. Kaufman for all further proceedings authorized by statute, local rules and general orders. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 2:25-cv-00756-SVW (MBK) absent further order of the Court. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
7 7 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 02/06 5:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Respondent Warden, re Notice of Appearance5 AMENDED served on February 6, 2025. (Lecedre, Johnpaul)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 02/06 4:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Respondent Warden, re Notice of Appearance5 served on February 6, 2025. (Lecedre, Johnpaul)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Thu 02/06 6:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Johnpaul Lecedre on behalf of Respondent Warden (Attorney Johnpaul Lecedre added to party Warden(pty:res))(Lecedre, Johnpaul)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/03 11:19 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner shall serve upon Respondent or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon Respondent's attorneys, a copy of every future pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. (vmun)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Requiring Return/Answer to Petition Mon 02/03 11:13 AM
ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent file an Answer to the Petition within twenty-three (23) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Petitioner desires to file a Reply to the Answer, Petitioner shall do so within fifteen (15) days of the date that the Answer is filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondent shall give timely notice of any court proceeding to any person who is a crime victim within the meaning of 18 U.S.C. section 3771. (vmun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Petition,
Att: 2 Notice of Reference
Saturday, February 01, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form Sat 02/01 10:59 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Sat 02/01 10:57 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick.(Filing fee $ 5 PAID), filed by Petitioner Richard Verret. (car)
Related: [-]