Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:J Randal Hall
Referred: Brian K Epps
Case #: 1:25-cv-00024
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 5:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Jacobson Transportation Company, Inc.
Represented By
William M. Davis
Bovis, Kyle, Burch & Medlin, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rodger Rice
Represented By
David P. Dekle
David P. Dekle P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
14 14 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/30 9:45 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/6/2025. Discovery due by 10/1/2025. Motions due by 10/31/2025. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 8/14/2025. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 9/13/2025. Status Report due by 10/1/2025.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/30/15. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
13 13 motion Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 04/28 4:41 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dekle, David)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 04/28 5:45 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (csr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Mon 04/21 12:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Jacobson Transportation Company, Inc.. (Davis, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 04/17 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re 10 Certificate of Counsel. If action is required, after 14 days of noncompliance a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 5/1/2025. (thb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
10 10 notice Certificate of Counsel Wed 04/16 9:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel Corporate Disclosure Statement by William M. Davis on behalf of Jacobson Transportation Company, Inc. (Davis, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/04 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re: 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1). After 14 days of noncompliance a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 4/18/2025. (csr)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/04 3:23 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Jacobson Transportation Company, Inc..(Davis, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/18 3:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rodger Rice. (Dekle, David)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/18 3:47 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Jacobson Transportation Company, Inc. answer due 4/4/2025. (thb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Mon 02/03 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Filing by Rodger Rice re1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Dekle, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Rule 26(f) Order Mon 02/03 11:04 AM
RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/03/2025. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Case Forms.
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/03 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. If action is required, after 14 days of noncompliance a notice will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. (Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 2/17/2025.) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Form.) (jlh)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/03 10:55 AM
COMPLAINT against Jacobson Transportation Company, Inc., filed by Rodger Rice. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3989559, $405.00.) (jlh)
Related: [-]