California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:25-cv-00898
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 2:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Jaime S. Schwartz, MD PC
Represented By
Michael Keith Grimaldi
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
MD Jaime S Schwartz
Represented By
Michael Keith Grimaldi
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 1
Represented By
Charles Stuart Lew
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Jimmie Davis Parker
Robinson Markevitch And Parker LLP
contact info
David Markevitch
Robinson Markevitch LLP
contact info
Damion D. D. Robinson
Robinson Markevitch LLP
contact info
Isaiah Thomas Artest
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 2
Represented By
Charles Stuart Lew
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Jimmie Davis Parker
Robinson Markevitch And Parker LLP
contact info
David Markevitch
Robinson Markevitch LLP
contact info
Isaiah Thomas Artest
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 3
Represented By
Charles Stuart Lew
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Jimmie Davis Parker
Robinson Markevitch And Parker LLP
contact info
David Markevitch
Robinson Markevitch LLP
contact info
Isaiah Thomas Artest
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 4
Represented By
Charles Stuart Lew
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Jimmie Davis Parker
Robinson Markevitch And Parker LLP
contact info
David Markevitch
Robinson Markevitch LLP
contact info
Isaiah Thomas Artest
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 5
Represented By
Charles Stuart Lew
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Jimmie Davis Parker
Robinson Markevitch And Parker LLP
contact info
David Markevitch
Robinson Markevitch LLP
contact info
Isaiah Thomas Artest
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 6
Represented By
Charles Stuart Lew
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Jimmie Davis Parker
Robinson Markevitch And Parker LLP
contact info
David Markevitch
Robinson Markevitch LLP
contact info
Isaiah Thomas Artest
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 7
Represented By
Charles Stuart Lew
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Jimmie Davis Parker
Robinson Markevitch And Parker LLP
contact info
David Markevitch
Robinson Markevitch LLP
contact info
Isaiah Thomas Artest
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 8
Represented By
Charles Stuart Lew
Lew Firm Apc
contact info
Jimmie Davis Parker
Robinson Markevitch And Parker LLP
contact info
David Markevitch
Robinson Markevitch LLP
contact info
Isaiah Thomas Artest
Lew Firm Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
32 32 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/29 4:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 15, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 12, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 16, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 9, Jane Doe 14, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 11, Jane Doe 8, Jane Doe 10, Jane Doe 4(an individual and), Jane Doe 13. upon Total Lipedema Care waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/28/2024, answer due 6/27/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Jaime Schwartz. (Markevitch, David)
Related: [-]
31 31 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/29 4:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 15, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 12, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 16, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 9, Jane Doe 14, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 11, Jane Doe 8, Jane Doe 10, Jane Doe 4(an individual and), Jane Doe 13. upon Karen L. Herbst, MD, PC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/28/2025, answer due 6/27/2025. Waiver of Service signed by Karen L. Herbst, MD, PC. (Markevitch, David)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/29 4:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 15, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 12, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 16, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 9, Jane Doe 14, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 11, Jane Doe 8, Jane Doe 10, Jane Doe 4(an individual and), Jane Doe 13. upon Karen L. Herbst, MD waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/28/2025. Waiver of Service signed by Karen L. Herbst, MD. (Markevitch, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
29 29 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 9:27 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition,22 as to Defendant Karen L. Herbst, MD, PC. (aco)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 9:26 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition,22 as to Defendant Total Lipedema Care. (aco)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 9:25 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition,22 as to Defendant Karen L. Herbst, MD. (aco)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
26 26 notice Summons Request Sat 04/26 12:54 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,22 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 10, Jane Doe 11, Jane Doe 12, Jane Doe 13, Jane Doe 14, Jane Doe 15, Jane Doe 16, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4(an individual and), Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8, Jane Doe 9. (Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Summons Request Sat 04/26 12:52 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,22 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 10, Jane Doe 11, Jane Doe 12, Jane Doe 13, Jane Doe 14, Jane Doe 15, Jane Doe 16, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4(an individual and), Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8, Jane Doe 9. (Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Summons Request Sat 04/26 12:51 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,22 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 10, Jane Doe 11, Jane Doe 12, Jane Doe 13, Jane Doe 14, Jane Doe 15, Jane Doe 16, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4(an individual and), Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8, Jane Doe 9. (Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
23 23 notice Related Case(s) Fri 04/18 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 10, Jane Doe 11, Jane Doe 12, Jane Doe 13, Jane Doe 14, Jane Doe 15, Jane Doe 16, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4(an individual and), Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8, Jane Doe 9. Related Case(s): 2:25-cv-02263 (Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
22 22 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 04/04 6:36 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Plaintiffs amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 , filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 8, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 4(an individual and)(Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/24 10:35 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RE: FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge George H Wu. The Court, having considered the parties' Stipulation re: Filing of First Amended Complaint, and finding good cause, hereby APPROVES the Stipulation as follows: 1. Plaintiffs Jane Does 1 through 8 are given leave to file a First Amended Complaint on or before April 4, 2025. 2. Defendants Jaime S. Schwartz, MD and Jaime S. Schwartz, MD PC ("Defendants") need not answer the operative Complaint currently on file. Defendants shall have until April 30, 2025 to respond to the First Amended Complaint. RE: STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint,20 . (aco)
Related: [-]
20 20 stip Amend/Correct Fri 03/21 10:49 AM
STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4(an individual and), Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8.(Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation re: Filing of First Amended Complaint
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
19 19 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Wed 03/19 2:13 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Stipulation to Amend/Correct17 by Judge George H Wu. Docket No. 17 is stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice18 filed on March 19, 2025. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 03/19 10:11 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Stipulation to Amend/Correct17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
17 17 stip Amend/Correct Tue 03/18 9:02 AM
STIPULATION to AMEND filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4(an individual and), Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8.(Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
16 16 notice Appearance Mon 03/17 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Keith Grimaldi on behalf of Defendants Jaime S Schwartz, Jaime S. Schwartz, MD PC (Attorney Michael Keith Grimaldi added to party Jaime S Schwartz(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Keith Grimaldi added to party Jaime S. Schwartz, MD PC(pty:dft))(Grimaldi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
15 15 10 pgs order Order Mon 02/24 3:24 PM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 02/20 12:01 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin to Judge George H Wu for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:25-cv-00898 GW(SSCx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
13 13 textonly MJDAP Timely Opt-Out Tue 02/18 3:05 PM
Declination of Consent form received on 2/15/2025 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cgm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
12 12 service Summons Issued Thu 02/06 9:30 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Jaime S. Schwartz, MD PC, Jaime S Schwartz.(es)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons.2
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
11 11 notice Summons Request Wed 02/05 5:35 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4(an individual and), Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8. (Markevitch, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Summons Request Wed 02/05 5:27 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4(an individual and), Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8. (Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]
9 9 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 02/05 10:55 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Under Pseudonym. (Dkt. 8.) The Court cannot rule on the motion until Defendants are served with the Complaint and have an opportunity to file a response. Accordingly, the Court directs Plaintiffs to file with the Court proofs of service of the Complaint, Notice of Assignment, and Application to Proceed Under Pseudonym once Defendants are served. Once the proofs of service are filed, the Court will set a briefing schedule on the Application to Proceed Under Pseudonym. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lkr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
8 8 motion Leave Tue 02/04 4:43 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed under Pseudonyms filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4(an individual and), Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8. (Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Damion Robinson,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
7 7 notice Deficiency in Summons Tue 02/04 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request5 , Summons Request4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Tue 02/04 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 5 notice Summons Request Mon 02/03 8:47 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8. (Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 02/03 8:45 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8. (Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 02/03 8:43 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 02/03 8:37 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8. (Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]
1 1 55 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 02/03 8:33 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39026838 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 8, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 4. (Attorney Damion D. D. Robinson added to party Jane Doe 1(pty:pla), Attorney Damion D. D. Robinson added to party Jane Doe 2(pty:pla), Attorney Damion D. D. Robinson added to party Jane Doe 3(pty:pla), Attorney Damion D. D. Robinson added to party Jane Doe 4(pty:pla), Attorney Damion D. D. Robinson added to party Jane Doe 4(pty:pla), Attorney Damion D. D. Robinson added to party Jane Doe 5(pty:pla), Attorney Damion D. D. Robinson added to party Jane Doe 6(pty:pla), Attorney Damion D. D. Robinson added to party Jane Doe 7(pty:pla), Attorney Damion D. D. Robinson added to party Jane Doe 8(pty:pla))(Robinson, Damion)
Related: [-]