New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Case #: 1:25-cv-00961
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 6:21 AM EDT
Petitioner
Andrea K. Tantaros
Respondent
Elizabeth Ailes
Respondent
Dianne Brandi
Represented By
Krissy A Katzenstein
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Paul C. Evans
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Respondent
Irena Briganti
Represented By
Krissy A Katzenstein
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Paul C. Evans
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Respondent
Fox News Network, LLC
Represented By
Krissy A Katzenstein
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Paul C. Evans
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Respondent
Suzanne Scott
Represented By
Krissy A Katzenstein
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Paul C. Evans
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Respondent
William Shine
Represented By
Marion Joyce Bachrach
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Jonathan Nassau Halpern
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Elliot Archer Magruder
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
51 51 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/02 11:33 AM
PETITION FOR EXTRAORDINARY WRIT OF MANDAMUS filed in the U.S. Court of Appeals for the 2nd Circuit. USCA Case No. 25-1091 Document filed by Andrea K. Tantaros. (tp) (Main Document 51 replaced on 5/2/2025) (tp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
52 52 misc Letter Fri 05/02 1:57 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Broderick from Andrea K. Tantaros dated 5/1/2025 re: Formal Notice of Service of Emergency Writ of Mandamus and Application for Request for Stay of Arbitration Proceedings. Document filed by Andrea K. Tantaros. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter service 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Letter service 2
Friday, April 25, 2025
50 50 motion Compel Tue 04/29 1:45 PM
LETTER MOTION TO CORRECT MATERIAL ALTERATION OR TAMPERING OF CASE CAUSE / NATURE OF ACTION AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE ORDER TO CORRECT COURT DOCKETING ERROR addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Andrea K. Tantaros dated 4/25/2025. Document filed by Andrea K. Tantaros..(nd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2