Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Case #: 3:25-cv-01062
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 6:01 AM AST
Defendant
Antilles Insurance Company, PR
Represented By
Alicia Pamela Perez-Caballero
Saldana Carvajal & Velez Rive Psc
contact info
Defendant
Mapfre Praico Insurance Company, PR
Represented By
Ian P. Carvajal-Zarabozo
Saldana, Carvajal & Velez-Rive, Psc.
contact info
Defendant
Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority, PR
Defendant
Companies XYZ
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Richard Does
Defendant
Insurance Companies ABC and D
Plaintiff
Andre Raoul Gomez-Lopez Del Valle, FL
Represented By
Eduardo J. Cobian-Roig
Cobian Roig Law Office
contact info
Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino
Manuel San Juan Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Andres Ricardo Gomez-Lopez Del Valle, GE
Represented By
Eduardo J. Cobian-Roig
Cobian Roig Law Office
contact info
Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino
Manuel San Juan Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Roxanna Lopez-Del Valle
Represented By
Eduardo J. Cobian-Roig
Cobian Roig Law Office
contact info
Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino
Manuel San Juan Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
23 23 respoth Memorandum in Opposition Tue 05/13 10:29 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Andre Raoul Gomez-Lopez Del Valle, Andres Ricardo Gomez-Lopez Del Valle, Roxanna Lopez-Del Valle Re: 21 Order to Show Cause,19 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority filed by Andre Raoul Gomez-Lopez Del Valle, Andres Ricardo Gomez-Lopez Del Valle, Roxanna Lopez-Del Valle. (Cobian-Roig, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
22 22 motion In Compliance Fri 05/09 6:09 PM
Motion In Compliance as to 21 Order to Show Cause, filed by Eduardo J. Cobian-Roig on behalf of Andre Raoul Gomez-Lopez Del Valle, Andres Ricardo Gomez-Lopez Del Valle, Roxanna Lopez-Del Valle. Responses due by 5/23/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Cobian-Roig, Eduardo)
Related: [-] 21
21 21 order Order to Show Cause Fri 05/09 2:17 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the Motion for More Definite Statement, Docket No. 19, should not be deemed unopposed. Show Cause Response and Response to Motion due by 5/14/2025. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 5/9/2025. (LTE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
20 20 motion Extension of Time Wed 05/07 4:14 PM
Second MOTION for extension of time until May 22, 2025 to Plead filed by Alicia Pamela Perez-Caballero on behalf of Antilles Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/21/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Caballero, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
19 19 motion More Definite Statement Fri 05/02 9:47 AM
MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Idalia M. Diaz-Pedrosa on behalf of Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority. Responses due by 5/16/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Pedrosa, Idalia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion to Appear Wed 04/16 5:44 PM
ORDER noted and granted17 Motion for Leave to Appear and Extension of Time. Answer due by 5/12/2025. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 4/16/2025. (LTE)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
17 17 motion Appear Fri 04/11 3:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear and extension of time to file answer filed by Idalia M. Diaz-Pedrosa on behalf of Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority. Responses due by 4/25/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Pedrosa, Idalia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/08 3:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of Mapfre Praico Insurance Company.(Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/08 12:27 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time; granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting14 Motion for Extension of Time. Answers due by 5/7/2025. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 4/8/2025. (LTE)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
14 14 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/07 5:32 PM
MOTION for extension of time until May 7, 2025 to Plead filed by Alicia Pamela Perez-Caballero on behalf of Antilles Insurance Company. Responses due by 4/21/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Caballero, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/01 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando Sabater-Clavell on behalf of Mapfre Praico Insurance Company (Sabater-Clavell, Fernando)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/13 8:22 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025. (San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel) Modified on 3/14/2025 to edit docket text (ab)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/13 8:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Mapfre Praico Insurance Company served on 2/12/2025, answer due 3/5/2025. (San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel) Modified on 3/14/2025 to edit docket text (ab)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/13 8:16 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Antilles Insurance Company served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025. (San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel) Modified on 3/14/2025 to edit docket text (ab)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 08, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 03/08 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Extension of Time by Ian P. Carvajal-Zarabozo on behalf of Mapfre Praico Insurance Company (Carvajal-Zarabozo, Ian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time Thu 03/06 3:35 PM
MOTION for extension of time until April 7, 2025 to Plead filed by Alicia Pamela Perez-Caballero on behalf of Antilles Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/20/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Caballero, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/14 8:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANDRES R, GOMEZ, ANDRE R Gomez upon Antilles Insurance Company served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025. (San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/14 8:16 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANDRES R, GOMEZ, ANDRE R Gomez upon Mapfre Praico Insurance Company served on 2/12/2025, answer due 3/5/2025. (San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/14 8:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANDRES R, GOMEZ, ANDRE R Gomez upon Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025. (San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Docket Text Modification Wed 02/19 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re:5 Summons Returned Executed,6 Summons Returned Executed,7 Summons Returned Executed,. ***FILED IN ERROR Incomplete PDF*** Counsel to refile complete summons with both pages that includes proof of service. (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo J. Cobian-Roig on behalf of ANDRES R, GOMEZ, ANDRE R Gomez, LOPEZ ROXANNA (Cobian-Roig, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 02/04 10:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Antilles Insurance Company, Mapfre Praico Insurance Company, Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 02/04 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/03 2:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Antilles Insurance Company, COMPANIES WXandZ, INSURANCE COMPANIES A,B,C and D, JOHN DOE, Mapfre Praico Insurance Company, Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority, RICHARD DOES ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-8975111.), filed by LOPEZ ROXANNA, ANDRES R, GOMEZ, ANDRE R Gomez. Service due by 5/5/2025,(San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVE SHEET,
Att: 2 Category Sheet CATEGORY SHEET,
Att: 3 Summons PUERTO RICO AQUEDUCT AND SEWER AUTHORITY,
Att: 4 Summons MAPFRE PRAICO,
Att: 5 Summons ANTILLES INSURANCE COMPANY