Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: Lindsey R Vaala
Case #: 1:25-cv-00193
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 6:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Kimberly Holway
Represented By
Rachel Willer Adams
Thompsonmcmullan, P.C.
contact info
William Woodul Tunner
Thompsonmcmullan, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Wellpath, LLC
Represented By
Angela Boice Axselle
Wimbish Gentile Mccray & Roeber PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Vanover
Represented By
Abigail Sophia Grand
Victor M. Glasberg & Associates
contact info
Victor Michael Glasberg
Victor M. Glasberg & Associates
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Michael L. Chapman
Terminated: 02/20/2025
Represented By
Philip Corliss Krone
Cook, Craig & Francuzenko, PLLC
contact info
John David Coker
Cook, Craig & Francuzenko, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
30 30 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/05 3:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2025 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. Discovery due by 9/12/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/5/2025.(kgall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form,
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice
29 29 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/05 1:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Kimberly Holway.(Edwards, Daniel-Lester)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
28 28 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/21 4:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ryan Vanover. Kimberly Holway waiver sent on 3/21/2025, answer due 5/20/2025. (Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/21 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel-Lester Edwards on behalf of Kimberly Holway (Edwards, Daniel-Lester)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/14 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Woodul Tunner on behalf of Kimberly Holway (Tunner, William)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/14 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Willer Adams on behalf of Kimberly Holway (Adams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
24 24 service Summons Reissued Thu 02/27 8:08 AM
Summons Reissued as to Kimberly Holway. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronicallyissued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention andelectronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
23 23 misc Proposed Summons Wed 02/26 8:50 AM
Proposed Summons Alias Summons -- Kimberly Holway by Ryan Vanover. (Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Wed 02/26 8:48 AM
Notice of Correction : Filing user erroneously filed document publicly, Document has been placed under seal per ECF Order #21 re 22 Proposed summons. No further action needed at this time. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
22 22 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/25 4:38 PM
Proposed Summons Alias Summons -- Kimberly Holway by Ryan Vanover. (Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 02/25 7:23 AM
ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Stay [Dkt. No. 18] is DENIED, and it is hereby ORDERED that the Sheriff of Loudon County promptly provide the last known address for Kimberly Holway to attorney Victor M. Glasberg, who may share that address only with co-counsel Abigail S. Grand and the process server; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's counsel must file under seal any documents, including the summons and return of process materials, that contain the defendant's home address or other contact information; and it is further ORDERED that none of defendant's contact information may be shared with plaintiff (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/24/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Waiver of Mon 02/24 10:28 AM
Waiver of re18 MOTION to Stay ,19 Memorandum in Support Waiver of Hearing by Ryan Vanover (Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
19 19 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 02/24 10:26 AM
Memorandum in Support re18 MOTION to Stay filed by Ryan Vanover.(Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Stay Order
18 18 motion Stay Mon 02/24 10:23 AM
MOTION to Stay by Ryan Vanover.(Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 21, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Corliss Krone on behalf of Michael L. Chapman (Krone, Philip)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John David Coker on behalf of Michael L. Chapman (Coker, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
14 14 order So Ordered Thu 02/20 12:00 PM
So Ordered re13 NOTICE of dismissal of defendant Chapman filed by Ryan Vanover. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/20/2025. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice (other) Thu 02/20 8:12 AM
NOTICE by Ryan Vanover of dismissal of defendant Chapman (Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
12 12 respm Reply to Motion Wed 02/19 10:11 PM
Reply to Motion re2 MOTION Emergency Motion for Discovery and Stay filed by Ryan Vanover.(Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Propoed Bankruptcy Order
Friday, February 14, 2025
15 15 respoth Opposition Thu 02/20 2:49 PM
Special Appearance Opposition to2 MOTION Emergency Motion for Discovery and Stay filed by Wellpath, LLC. (dvanm) (dvanm, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/20/2025) Exhibit A,
Att: 2 (2/20/2025) Exhibit B
11 11 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Fri 02/14 5:12 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Ryan Vanover as to Kimberly Holway. (Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/14 5:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Vanover Michael L. Chapman served on 2/11/2025, answer due 3/4/2025 (Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order Prisoner Service (1983) Tue 02/11 3:38 PM
ORDERED that for these reasons, plaintiff's Emergency Motion [Dkt. No. 2] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and it is hereby ORDERED that, provided plaintiff does not violate any orders of the bankruptcy court, plaintiff may subpoena Wellpath LLC to provide, within ten days of the receipt of the subpoena by Wellpath's resident agent or a Wellpath officer or counsel, the full names and last known addresses of the three nurses identified in the Complaint. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 02/11/2025. See Order for further details. (triv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/05 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Sophia Grand on behalf of Ryan Vanover (Grand, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
7 7 misc Docket Annotation Tue 02/04 11:39 AM
Prisoner Database Sheet. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 02/04 11:35 AM
Summons Issued as to Michael L. Chapman, Kimberly Holway, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Mon 02/03 12:40 PM
Proposed Summons by Ryan Vanover (Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Waiver of Mon 02/03 12:28 PM
Waiver of re3 Memorandum in Support,2 MOTION Emergency Motion for Discovery and Stay Waiver of Hearing by Ryan Vanover (Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
3 3 6 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 02/03 12:27 PM
Memorandum in Support re2 MOTION Emergency Motion for Discovery and Stay filed by Ryan Vanover.(Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Mon 02/03 12:21 PM
MOTION Emergency Motion for Discovery and Stay by Ryan Vanover.(Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/03 12:16 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9984932.), filed by Ryan Vanover.(Glasberg, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 02/04 10:55 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]