Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nancy B King
Case #: 3:25-bk-00452
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Essex Technology Group, LLC
3815 Logistics Way
Antioch, TN 37013-2418
Represented By
DAVID W HOUSTON, IV
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203
Represented By
MEGAN REED SELIBER
Us Trustee'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 12:03 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
272 272 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 04/30 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 268 Transfer of Claim
271 271 notice Generic Notice - BK Notice Wed 04/30 12:48 PM
Notice of Second Monthly Fee Statement for Cole Schotz P.C. (March 1, 2025 - March 31, 2025) . Filed on the behalf of: Creditor Committee OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (EDWARDS, DEREK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
270 270 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Tue 04/29 11:53 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: Creditor TN Dept of Revenue. (BUTLER, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
269 269 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Payment Mon 04/28 8:11 AM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK:3:25-bk-00452] ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00). Receipt number A19225129. Fee amount $ 28.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#268
268 268 claims Transfer of Claim Mon 04/28 8:11 AM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: UPD, Inc. (d/b/a United Pacific Designs) To Insurance Company of the State Fee Amount is $28. Filed By: UPD, Inc.. (Rosen, Adam)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
267 267 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 04/26 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 266 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay - BK Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
266 266 order Relief from Stay - BK Order Thu 04/24 7:11 AM
Agreed Order Granting Truist Bank's Consent Motion for Relief from Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 362 and 553 . Related [+], BY THE COURT: Judge Nancy B. King. (anm)
Related: [-] Ref Doc #264