Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Melissa Damian
Case #: 0:25-cv-60181
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Terminated:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By
John Michael Marees, II
Messer Strickler, Ltd.
contact info
Lauren Marshall Burnette
Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Aidan Sanchez
Represented By
Gerald Donald Lane, Jr.
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi, PLLC
contact info
Faaris Kamal Uddin
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info
Zane Charles Hedaya
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 04/18 10:49 AM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement [ECF No.16 ], filed April 17, 2025. The above-styled action is administratively CLOSED without prejudice to the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. If the parties fail to complete the expected settlement, either party may request the Court to reopen the case. The Clerk shall CLOSE this case for administrative purposes only. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and any deadlines previously set are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 4/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 04/17 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Aidan Sanchez (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 04/07 4:50 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/18/2025. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 4/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (oco)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/31 3:50 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc.. (Burnette, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 03/18 10:37 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Status Conference. Finding good cause shown for the requested continuance, and noting the Motion is unopposed, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Status Conference scheduled for March 19, 2025 is CANCELED and will be rescheduled by separate order. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 3/18/2025. (oco)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
12 12 motion Continue Mon 03/17 8:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue re 11 Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing,7 Order Setting Status Conference by Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc.. Responses due by 3/31/2025.(Marees, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 14, 2025
11 11 order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Fri 03/14 2:26 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Resetting Hearing: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** The Status Conference is reset for 3/19/2025 at 1:30 PM in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Melissa Damian. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 3/14/2025. (oco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/04 6:05 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Marees, II on behalf of Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc.. Attorney John Michael Marees, II added to party Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc.(pty:dft). (Marees, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 03/04 4:25 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Aidan Sanchez. Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc. served on 2/6/2025, response/answer due 3/31/2025. (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 03/04 11:36 AM
ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER. Plaintiff must file proof of service by March 7, 2025. Failure to file proof of service by March 7, 2025, may result in sanctions, including a dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 3/3/2025. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Setting Status Conference Mon 03/03 10:55 AM
ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 3/19/2025 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Melissa Damian. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 2/28/2025. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 02/21 4:15 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc.. Response/Answer due 3/31/2025. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 2/21/2025. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 02/21 1:30 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc.. (Burnette, Lauren)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 02/21 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Marshall Burnette on behalf of Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc.. Attorney Lauren Marshall Burnette added to party Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc.(pty:dft). (Burnette, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 02/03 1:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc.. (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 02/03 1:33 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/03 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Checkers Drive-In Restaurants, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18172876, filed by Aidan Sanchez.(Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)