New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:25-cv-00951
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
KW PLASTICS
Represented By
RICHARD JON DAVIS
Maynard Nexsen PC
contact info
Plaintiff
PRETIUM PACKAGING, L.L.C.
Represented By
STEVEN MARC PARDALIS
Kiernan Trebach LLP
contact info
MATTHEW ADAM WURGAFT
Kiernan Trebach LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 05/13 10:53 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by KW PLASTICS re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (DAVIS, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
14 14 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/30 1:47 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by PRETIUM PACKAGING, L.L.C. re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Email
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Tue 04/29 5:15 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ROBER WILLIAM "BO" BLEDSOE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 04/28 3:56 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert William "Bo" Bledsoe to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16208281.) (DAVIS, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 4:45 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert W. Bledsoe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/22/2025. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
minutes Status Conference Tue 04/08 12:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 4/8/2025. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 1:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KW PLASTICS.(DAVIS, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit AL Certificate of Good Standing
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/07 4:26 PM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 5/5/2024 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
10 10 order Text Order Fri 03/28 4:42 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' stipulation as to the return date for defendant's motion to dismiss and adjourning the Rule 16 initial scheduling conference before the undersigned (ECF9 ). The stipulated briefing schedule is granted. The Rule 16 initial scheduling conference set for April 8, 2025 at 12:00 p.m. is hereby converted to a telephonic status conference before the undersigned and shall proceed at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/28/25. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation Thu 03/27 2:32 PM
STIPULATION re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by PRETIUM PACKAGING, L.L.C.. (WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
8 8 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 03/04 2:54 PM
LETTE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/8/2025 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/4/25. (LM, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/04 3:39 PM
Set Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue . Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
7 7 motion Dismiss Mon 03/03 4:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by KW PLASTICS. Responses due by 3/24/2025.(DAVIS, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief ISO MTD,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A to MTD - Affidavit of Russell Liles ISO MTD
Monday, February 17, 2025
6 6 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 02/17 1:53 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by PRETIUM PACKAGING, L.L.C.. (WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/13 2:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PRETIUM PACKAGING, L.L.C.. KW PLASTICS served on 2/10/2025, answer due 3/3/2025. (WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Thu 02/13 11:29 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The3 Diversity Disclosure Statement filed by MATTHEW WURGAFT on 2/12/2025 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (wh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 02/12 4:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRETIUM PACKAGING, L.L.C.. (WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 02/12 3:03 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by PRETIUM PACKAGING, L.L.C.. (WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 02/04 2:25 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to KW PLASTICS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (adc, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/04 11:49 AM
COMPLAINT against KW PLASTICS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15994148) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PRETIUM PACKING L.L.C..(WURGAFT, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/04 1:25 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (mfr)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 02/04 2:25 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (adc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/04 2:26 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (adc, )
Related: [-]