Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10824

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:25-ap-01025
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Litigation Discovery Group, Inc.
7660 Dean Martin Dr., Ste. 202
Las Vegas, NV 89139
Represented By
Litigation Discovery Group, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa M. Shambro
Represented By
Lindsay Riley
Wadsworth Garber Warner Conrardy, P.C.
contact info
David Wadsworth
Wadsworth Garber Warner Conrardy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/30 10:18 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Clerks Entry of Default
Monday, April 28, 2025
8 8 order Virtual Clerks Entry of Default Mon 04/28 4:07 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default As To Litigation Discovery Group, Inc. Related [+]. (dd)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 motion Default Judgment Fri 04/25 9:51 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Litigation Discovery Group, Inc. Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of Lisa M. Shambro. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Verification
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Att: 3 Other Judgment
6 6 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 04/25 9:49 AM
Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of Lisa M. Shambro Related [+]. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Other Verification
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order Entry of Default
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 5 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 02/03 2:49 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Lindsay Riley on behalf of Lisa M. Shambro. (Riley, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
4 4 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 02/03 10:13 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-01025 MER] ) ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A33386000. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Mon 02/03 10:00 AM
Summons Service Executed On: Litigation Discovery Group, Inc. on February 3, 2025 Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of Lisa M. Shambro. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 02/03 9:34 AM
Summons Issued on Litigation Discovery Group, Inc. Answer Due 03/5/2025. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/03 9:20 AM
Adversary case 25-01025 Complaint by Lisa M. Shambro against Litigation Discovery Group, Inc.. Fee to be Deferred. Adversary Status Deadline 05/5/2025 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]