Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:J Randal Hall
Referred: Brian K Epps
Case #: 1:25-cv-00025
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause42:12117 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 5:26 AM EDT
Defendant
ADT LLC
Plaintiff
Cameron Sizemore
Represented By
Matthew C. Billips
Barrett & Farahany
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 04/16 11:18 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this case are stayed. The parties are ordered to provide a Status Report within 7 days of the mediation date. Signed by District Judge J. Randal Hall on 4/16/2025. (pts)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Leave of Absence Tue 04/15 3:58 PM
TEXT ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/15/25. (cjc)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Leave of Absence Tue 04/15 12:58 PM
MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Cameron Sizemore for dates of : June 2-6, 2025 by Cameron Sizemore. Responses due by 4/29/2025. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 04/15 1:45 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:11 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Cameron Sizemore for dates of: June 2-6, 2025. (csr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
10 10 motion Stay Wed 04/09 4:30 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Mediation by ADT LLC. Responses due by 4/23/2025.(Boehm, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 07, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/07 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Lerner on behalf of ADT LLC (Lerner, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Mon 04/07 2:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by ADT LLC. (Boehm, Edward)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/07 2:34 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ADT LLC.(Boehm, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Tue 03/18 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re 5 Notice. (thb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 02/05 4:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cameron Sizemore. ADT LLC waiver sent on 2/5/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
3 3 order Rule 26(f) Order Mon 02/03 2:49 PM
RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/03/2025. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Case Forms.
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 02/03 2:47 PM
Summons Issued as to ADT LLC. (jlh)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/03 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT against ADT LLC, filed by Cameron Sizemore. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3989957, $405.00.) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)
Related: [-]