Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald A Mchugh
Case #: 2:25-cv-00586
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Case in other court:Philadephia CCP, 250100620
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 5:36 AM EDT
Defendant
ASTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.
1725 Shepherd Road
Chattanooga, TN 37421
Represented By
JEFF G. GRANILLO
Chambliss, Bahner & Stophel, P.C.
contact info
RAYMOND J. HUNTER
Segal Mccambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd
contact info
Defendant
ASTEC, INC.
4101 Jerome Avenue
Chattanooga, TN 37407
Represented By
JEFF G. GRANILLO
Chambliss, Bahner & Stophel, P.C.
contact info
RAYMOND J. HUNTER
Segal Mccambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd
contact info
Defendant
TEREX CORPORATION
301 Merritt 7 4th Floor
Norwalk, CT 06851
Represented By
FRANCIS J. GREY, JR.
Ricci Tyrrell Johnson & Grey
contact info
REBECCA E. LEONARD
Ricci Tyrrell Johnson & Grey
contact info
Defendant
TEREX USA, LLC
600 N. 2nd Street Suite 401
Harrisburg, PA 17101
Represented By
REBECCA E. LEONARD
Ricci Tyrrell Johnson & Grey
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE (1-10)
Plaintiff
CAITLIN BYRNE
Represented By
JESSICA A. COLLIVER
Eisenberg, Rothweiler, Winkler, Eisenberg & Jeck
contact info
FREDRIC S. EISENBERG
Eisenberg, Rothweiler, Winkler, Eisenberg & Jeck P.C.
contact info
DANIEL JOSEPH SHERRY, JR.
Eisenberg, Rothweiler, Winkler, Eisenberg & Jeck P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
COREY BYRNE
123 Grouse Hill Road
Greenfield, PA 18407
Represented By
JESSICA A. COLLIVER
Eisenberg, Rothweiler, Winkler, Eisenberg & Jeck
contact info
FREDRIC S. EISENBERG
Eisenberg, Rothweiler, Winkler, Eisenberg & Jeck P.C.
contact info
DANIEL JOSEPH SHERRY, JR.
Eisenberg, Rothweiler, Winkler, Eisenberg & Jeck P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
25 25 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 04/30 11:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH. Pretrial Conference held in chambers on 4/29/25 (mbh)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/30 11:15 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL REMAINING FACTUAL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 7/17/2026. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 12/15/2026. MSIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 4/29/25. 4/30/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
23 23 misc Report Of Thu 04/24 1:18 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting on behalf of all parties by ASTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., ASTEC, INC.. (GRANILLO, JEFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 04/23 2:33 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF WILLIAM R. DEARING, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b)21 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 4/23/25. 4/23/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 04/23 10:43 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18236741.) filed by ASTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., ASTEC, INC..Certificate of Service.(ROSENBERG, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN B. ROSENBERG on behalf of ASTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., ASTEC, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 04/22 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by FREDRIC S. EISENBERG on behalf of CAITLIN BYRNE, COREY BYRNE(EISENBERG, FREDRIC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 03/26 3:53 PM
NOTICE: A RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD WITH JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 4/29/2025 AT 2:30 PM IN CHAMBERS. (mbh) (Main Document 18 replaced on 3/26/2025) (mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/19 3:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with to Plaintiffs' Complaint by TEREX CORPORATION.(GREY, FRANCIS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
16 16 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Wed 03/12 4:11 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by TEREX CORPORATION re15 Disclosure Statement Form . (GREY, FRANCIS)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 03/12 4:07 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with certificate of service by TEREX CORPORATION.(GREY, FRANCIS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 03/07 4:27 PM
ORDER THAT THE13 APPLICATION TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 3/7/25. 3/7/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 03/07 2:29 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice obo Jeffrey G. Granillo, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18126680.) filed by ASTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., ASTEC, INC..Motion for PHV - Proposed Order, Applicant Statement, Sponsor Statement, Motion & Certificate of Service.(HUNTER, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
12 12 misc Praecipe/Request Tue 03/04 12:38 PM
EOA.JAC by CAITLIN BYRNE, COREY BYRNE. (COLLIVER, JESSICA)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Joinder Mon 03/03 11:14 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT TEREX CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND SUPPORTING ALLEGATIONS AND DEFENDANTS ASTEC, INC. AND ASTEC INDUSTRIES, INC'S JOINDER TO THAT MOTION ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 2/28/25. 3/3/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Joinder Fri 02/28 12:37 PM
MOTION for Joinder filed by ASTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., ASTEC, INC..Order (Proposed), Joinder, Certificate of Service.(HUNTER, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/24 10:38 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's claims of recklessness Willful and Wanton Misconduct, and for Punitive Damages filed by CAITLIN BYRNE, COREY BYRNE.(SHERRY, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A Complaint
Thursday, February 20, 2025
8 8 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Thu 02/20 8:40 AM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(nd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Consent Form
Monday, February 10, 2025
7 7 motion Dismiss Mon 02/10 9:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's claims of recklessness Willful and Wanton Misconduct, and for Punitive Damages filed by TEREX CORPORATION.Brief, COS.(GREY, FRANCIS)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/10 4:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by ASTEC INDUSTRIES, INC..(HUNTER, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/10 4:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by ASTEC, INC..(HUNTER, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
4 4 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Tue 02/04 4:32 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by ASTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. re1 Notice of Removal (Attorney),, Corporate Disclosure Statement (Astec Industries, Inc.) . (HUNTER, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Tue 02/04 4:29 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by ASTEC, INC. re1 Notice of Removal (Attorney),, Corporate Disclosure Statement (Astec, Inc.) . (HUNTER, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/04 2:57 PM
NOTICE by ASTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., ASTEC, INC. re1 Notice of Removal (Attorney),, Civil Cover Sheet - signed, dated (HUNTER, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Tue 02/04 9:50 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED CIVIL COVER SHEET in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. CIVIL COVER SHEET is missing a signature. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Mon 02/03 5:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ASTEC, INC., ASTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. Civil Cover Sheet (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18049357), filed by ASTEC, INC., ASTEC INDUSTRIES, INC..(HUNTER, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Designation Form,
Att: 2 Supplement Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement (Astec, Inc.),
Att: 4 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement (Astec Industries, Inc.),
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Documents,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit B - Consent to Removal (Terex)