Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 9:25-bk-90001
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc.
8180 Lakeview Ctr Ste 300
Odessa, TX 79765-8872
Represented By
Thomas Daniel Berghman
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr PC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, May 23, 2025
352 352 notice Notice (generic) Fri 05/23 6:46 PM
Notice First Fee Summary of Lain, Faulkner & Co., P.C. filed by Accountant Lain, Faulkner & Co., P.C. Related [+]. (Petree, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 248 Order granting motion to Establish Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Estate Professionals (related document103 ) Entered on 4/17/2025. (Castaneda, Esther) MODIFIED text on 4/18/2025 (ec).
351 351 notice Notice (generic) Fri 05/23 6:44 PM
Notice First Fee Summary of Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. filed by Attorney Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. Related [+]. (Petree, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 248 Order granting motion to Establish Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Estate Professionals (related document103 ) Entered on 4/17/2025. (Castaneda, Esther) MODIFIED text on 4/18/2025 (ec).
350 350 notice Notice of hearing Fri 05/23 2:47 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 6/25/2025 at 09:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/mullin for284 , (Petree, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 284 Disclosure statement filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc. (RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary petition (chapter 11)).
349 349 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Fri 05/23 11:54 AM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Creditor Prosperity Bank Related [+]. (Chiarello, Annmarie)
Related: [-] 15 Motion regarding pre-petition claims. Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and (II) Granting Related Relief ,17 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Emergency Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (a) Continue Use of Existing Business Forms and Records, (b) Continue to Operate their Cash Management System and Maintain Existing Corporate Bank Account, 26 Motion to use cash collateral Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Use Cash Collateral; (II) Granting Adequate Protection; (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay; (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing;
348 348 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Fri 05/23 11:30 AM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc. Related [+]. (Petree, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 15 Motion regarding pre-petition claims. Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and (II) Granting Related Relief ,17 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Emergency Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (a) Continue Use of Existing Business Forms and Records, (b) Continue to Operate their Cash Management System and Maintain Existing Corporate Bank Account, 26 Motion to use cash collateral Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Use Cash Collateral; (II) Granting Adequate Protection; (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay; (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing;
Thursday, May 22, 2025
347 347 notice Notice of hearing Thu 05/22 4:36 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 5/27/2025 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/mullin for17 and for26 and for15 , (Petree, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 15 Motion regarding pre-petition claims. Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),17 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Emergency Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (a) Continue Use of Existing Business Forms and Records, (b) Continue to Operate their Cash Management System and Maintain Existing Corporate Bank Accounts, and (c) Continue Intercompany Transactions, (II) Waiving Certain U.S. Trustee Requirements, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),26 Motion to use cash collateral Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Use Cash Collateral; (II) Granting Adequate Protection; (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay; (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing; and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
346 346 order Employ Thu 05/22 3:23 PM
Order granting application to employ Porter Hedges LLP as Attorney Related [+] Entered on 5/22/2025. (Dozier, Bryan)
Related: [-] 260
345 345 misc Certificate of service Thu 05/22 1:18 PM
Certificate of service re: Motion to Extend Deadline to Assume or Reject Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Docket No. 340), Debtors Motion to Extend Plan Exclusivity Periods (Docket No. 341) Filed by Claims Agent Stretto, Inc. Related [+]. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 340 Motion to extend time to Assume or Reject Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc. Objections due by 6/13/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc.,341 Motion to extend or limit the exclusivity period Filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc. Objections due by 6/13/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc.
344 344 misc List (witness/exhibit/generic) Thu 05/22 11:17 AM
Witness and Exhibit List / Committee's Witness and Exhibit List for May 27th Hearing (contined from May 14, 2025) filed by Other Professional Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Johnson, Michael)
Related: [-] 15 Motion regarding pre-petition claims. Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and (II) Granting Related Relief ,17 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Emergency Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (a) Continue Use of Existing Business Forms and Records, (b) Continue to Operate their Cash Management System and Maintain Existing Corporate Bank Account, 26 Motion to use cash collateral Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Use Cash Collateral; (II) Granting Adequate Protection; (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay; (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing;
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
343 343 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 05/21 9:29 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2025 filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc.. (Petree, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
342 342 order Employ Tue 05/20 3:44 PM
Order granting application to employ Riveron RTS, LLC as Financial Adviser Related [+] Entered on 5/20/2025. (Dozier, Bryan)
Related: [-] 261
341 341 motion Extend/Shorten time Tue 05/20 3:25 PM
Motion to extend or limit the exclusivity period Filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc. Objections due by 6/13/2025. (Petree, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
340 340 motion Extend/Shorten time Tue 05/20 3:24 PM
Motion to extend time to Assume or Reject Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc. Objections due by 6/13/2025. (Petree, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
339 339 notice Notice of hearing Tue 05/20 10:54 AM
Notice of hearing Related [+] filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Royalty Interest Owners Group. Hearing to be held on 6/23/2025 at 09:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/mullin for125 , (Haitz, Eric)
Related: [-] set125 Motion to appoint creditors committee (Emergency Motion of the Ad Hoc Royality Interest Owners Group Group for Entry of an Order Directing the Appointment of an Official Committee of Royalty Interest Owners) Filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Royalty Interest Owners Group
Monday, May 19, 2025
338 338 misc Certificate of no objection Mon 05/19 8:46 PM
Certificate of no objection filed by Other Professional Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (English, Eric)
Related: [-] 260 Application to employ Porter Hedges LLP as Attorney - Application to Approve the Employment of Porter Hedges LLP as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Att: 1 Exhibit A
337 337 misc Certificate of no objection Mon 05/19 8:40 PM
Certificate of no objection filed by Other Professional Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (English, Eric)
Related: [-] 261 Application to employ Riveron RTS, LLC as Financial Advisor - Application of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Sections 328(a) and 1103 of the Bankruptcy Code, Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedures 2014(a) and 2016, and Loca
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
336 336 misc Certificate of service Mon 05/19 4:22 PM
Certificate of service re: Notice of Hearing (Docket No. 333), Amended Notice of Hearing on the United States Trustees Motion for an Order Directing the Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustees Under 11 U.S.C. § 1104(a) (Docket No. 334) Filed by Claims Agent Stretto, Inc. Related [+]. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 333 Notice of hearing filed by Other Professional Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: related document(s)312 Motion for leave - The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Emergency Motion for Substantive Consolidation of Debtors' Estates Filed by Other Professional Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Objections due by 5/28/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order)). Hearing to be held on 6/13/2025 at 09:30 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm. for312 , filed by Other Professional Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors,334 Amended Notice of hearing filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (RE: related document(s)183 Motion to appoint trustee Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee). Hearing to be held on 6/23/2025 at 09:30 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm. for183 , filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee
335 335 misc Certificate of service Mon 05/19 4:20 PM
Certificate of service re: Application to Employ Lain, Faulkner & Co., P.C. as Accountants for the Oregon Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date (Docket No. 324), Application to Employ Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. as Attorneys for the Oregon Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date (Docket No. 325), Fourth Interim Order Granting Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Use Cash Collateral; (II) Granting Adequate Protection; (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay; (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing; and (V) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 330) Filed by Claims Agent Stretto Related [+]. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 324 Application to employ Lain, Faulkner & Co., P.C. as Accountant Application to Employ Lain, Faulkner & Co., P.C. as Accountants for the Oregon Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc.,325 Application to employ Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. as Attorney Application to Employ Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. as Attorneys for the Oregon Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) filed by Debtor Scanrock Oil & Gas, Inc.,330 Order interimly granting motion to use cash collateral (related document26 ) Hearing to be held on 5/27/2025 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/mullin for26 , Entered on 5/14/2025.