Hawaii District Court
Judge:J Michael Seabright
Case #: 1:25-cv-00048
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 11:32 PM HST
Defendant
Eye Productions, Inc.
Defendant
Paramount Pictures Corporation
Defendant
Viacom CBS
Plaintiff
Marques Scanlan
Represented By
Michael P. Healy
contact info
Charles H. Brower
Pioneer Plaza
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM HST
Monday, May 05, 2025
19 19 misc Scheduling Conference Statement Mon 05/05 7:43 PM
Scheduling Conference Statement . (Healy, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Case Reassignment Mon 05/05 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil case number CV 25-00048 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Consent Election Form Mon 05/05 8:49 AM
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Report of Planning Meeting Mon 05/05 8:46 AM
REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting . (Miyashita, Andrea)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Scheduling Conference Statement Mon 05/05 8:45 AM
Scheduling Conference Statement . (Miyashita, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/22 12:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eye Productions, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Paramount Global for Eye Productions, Inc... (Miyashita, Andrea)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 04/22 12:02 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint by Eye Productions, Inc..(Miyashita, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
12 12 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 11:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Eye Productions, Inc. (jni)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/04 10:48 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eye Productions, Inc., filed by Marques Scanlan.(Brower, Charles) Modified on 4/4/2025 (jni)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Jury Demand,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/11 10:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marques Scanlan. Eye Productions, Inc. served on 3/10/2025. (Brower, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
9 9 minutes 2 - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 03/07 12:35 PM
EO: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Court CONTINUES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 3/31/2025 to 5/12/2025 at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
8 8 misc Consent Election Form Fri 02/28 12:50 PM
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
7 7 misc Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Mon 02/03 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 02/03 12:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Viacom CBS, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Eye Productions, Inc. (jni)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Civil Waiver of Service Packet Mon 02/03 12:47 PM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (jni)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons,
Att: 2 Waiver of the Service of Summons
4 4 misc Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/03 12:46 PM
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements - Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Mon 02/03 12:45 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/31/2025 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 2/3/2025. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 02/03 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 25-00048 WRP on all further pleadings . (jni)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/03 11:25 AM
COMPLAINT against Viacom CBS, Paramount Pictures Corporation, and Eye Productions, Inc. Marques Scanlan ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-3111453.), filed by Marques Scanlan.(Brower, Charles) Modified on 2/3/2025 (jni)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Jury Demand,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet