New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Orelia E Merchant
Case #: 2:25-cv-00602
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Sundas Naqvi
Defendant
Wyandanch Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff
Abid Hasan
Represented By
Raymond Nardo
Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
11 11 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 05/02 10:29 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendants Sundas Naqvi and Wyandanch Pharmacy, Inc., have failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the defaults of defendants Sundas Naqvi and Wyandanch Pharmacy, Inc., are hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JT)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 05/02 11:13 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of Defendants' default, as certified by the Clerk of the Court, the initial conference scheduled for June 3, 2025 is CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/2/2025. (DM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined Tue 04/29 10:19 AM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (DM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/29 10:33 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Orelia E. Merchant and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
10 10 misc Request for Certificate of Default Mon 04/28 2:33 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Abid Hasan (Nardo, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Certificate of Default,
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment (Certificate of Default),
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
9 9 misc Letter Mon 04/28 2:30 PM
Letter to disregard Docket #8 by Abid Hasan (Nardo, Raymond)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Request for Certificate of Default Mon 04/28 2:25 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Abid Hasan (Nardo, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Certificate of Default,
Att: 2 Proposed Order for Certificate of Default,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/18 9:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abid Hasan. Sundas Naqvi served on 2/17/2025, answer due 3/10/2025. (Nardo, Raymond)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/18 9:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abid Hasan. Wyandanch Pharmacy, Inc. served on 2/13/2025, answer due 3/6/2025. (Nardo, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
5 5 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/05 10:51 AM
ORDER: An IN-PERSON Initial Conference is set for 6/3/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. See order and attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/5/2025. (JT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AYS RULES
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/04 10:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Sundas Naqvi, Wyandanch Pharmacy, Inc.. (SMF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Tue 02/04 10:13 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SMF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 02/04 10:10 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (SMF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/04 10:11 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/03 6:14 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18729257 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Abid Hasan. (Nardo, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet