Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Eldon E Fallon
Referred: Donna Phillips Currault
Case #: 2:25-cv-00248
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 1:09 PM CDT
Defendant
Surechoice Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Ann Whalen Gesvantner
Represented By
William S. Vincent, Jr.
Law Office Of William S. Vincent, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
4 4 service Summons Submitted for Issuance Thu 05/15 1:49 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Vincent, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 02/05 9:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Surechoice Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. (gla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 02/04 11:53 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/04 11:46 AM
COMPLAINT against SURECHOICE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE and SAGESURE (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10870706) filed by Elizabeth Ann Gesvantner.Attorney William S. Vincent, Jr added to party Elizabeth Ann Gesvantner(pty:pla).(Vincent, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons