New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Case #: 1:25-cv-00995
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 6:26 AM EDT
Defendant
David Geffen
Represented By
Tibor Ludovico Nagy, Jr.
Nagy Wolfe Appleton LLP
contact info
Gregory Nathaniel Wolfe
Nagy Wolfe Appleton LLP
contact info
Arian Soroush
Nagy Wolfe Appleton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ithaka Trust
Represented By
Tibor Ludovico Nagy, Jr.
Nagy Wolfe Appleton LLP
contact info
Gregory Nathaniel Wolfe
Nagy Wolfe Appleton LLP
contact info
Arian Soroush
Nagy Wolfe Appleton LLP
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
Le Nez
Plaintiff
Sun, Yuchen Justin
Represented By
Maya Katalan
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
William Laurence Charron
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Paul Cossu
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
21 21 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/18 2:53 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by David Geffen, Ithaka Trust..(Nagy, Tibor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 04/16 9:29 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Sun, Yuchen Justin. Document filed by Ithaka Trust, David Geffen..(Nagy, Tibor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Sun Side Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - December 18 WhatsApp Message,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - December Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Xiong Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - NWA Letter,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Terminating Sanctions Order
Monday, April 07, 2025
19 19 misc Letter Mon 04/07 11:43 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from William L. Charron and Tibor L. Nagy, Jr. dated April 7, 2025 re: Magistrate Judge. Document filed by Sun, Yuchen Justin..(Katalan, Maya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 02/19 1:24 PM
ORDER granting17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/19/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 02/19 1:25 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: David Geffen answer due 4/16/2025; Ithaka Trust answer due 4/16/2025. (vfr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Time Tue 02/18 4:48 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint and for parties to submit a Jointly Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Tibor L. Nagy, Jr. dated February 18, 2025. Document filed by David Geffen, Ithaka Trust..(Nagy, Tibor)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arian Soroush on behalf of David Geffen, Ithaka Trust..(Soroush, Arian)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Nathaniel Wolfe on behalf of David Geffen, Ithaka Trust..(Wolfe, Gregory)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 12:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tibor Ludovico Nagy, Jr on behalf of David Geffen, Ithaka Trust..(Nagy, Tibor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Scheduling Order Wed 02/05 1:18 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by April 7, 2025, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/5/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs order Order Wed 02/05 1:16 PM
ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by April 7, 2025, file a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, as further set forth herein. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by April 7, 2025, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/5/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/05 1:14 PM
ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/5/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 02/05 12:12 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Geffen..(gp)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 02/05 12:12 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ithaka Trust..(gp)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/05 10:49 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Katalan, Maya)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 02/05 10:24 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Laurence Charron. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $80,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/05 10:26 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney William Laurence Charron to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Nature of Suit section on the PDF has multiple selections. Place an X in ONE Nature of Suit box. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 02/05 11:50 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 02/05 11:50 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 02/05 11:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
7 7 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maya Katalan on behalf of Sun, Yuchen Justin..(Katalan, Maya)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 1:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Cossu on behalf of Sun, Yuchen Justin.(Cossu, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/04 12:51 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ithaka Trust, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Sun, Yuchen Justin.(Charron, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/04 12:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Geffen, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Sun, Yuchen Justin.(Charron, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/04 12:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Charron, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/04 12:47 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sun, Yuchen Justin.(Charron, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/04 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT against David Geffen, Ithaka Trust, Le Nez (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30562966)Document filed by Sun, Yuchen Justin.(Charron, William)
Related: [-]