Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Claria Horn Boom
Referred: Hanly A Ingram
Case #: 6:25-cv-00014
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Patrick Farris
Billings Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Ronald Curry
Represented By
James Robert Craig
The Craig Firm
contact info
Noah Kane
Consumer Attorneys PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
22 22 motion Compel Fri 05/16 9:11 PM
MOTION to Compel by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(Farris, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/13 3:26 PM
ORDER re20 AMENDED MOTION for Order by Christopher Ronald Curry for Expedited Response to Requests for Production Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(A) : On May 9, 2025, Plaintiff Curry, through counsel, filed an amended motion for expedited response to a request for production. D.E. 20. In the motion, Plaintiff requests a telephonic status conference before the undersigned to discuss the request. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the TELECONFERENCE is SCHEDULED for 5/21/2025 at11:00 AM . To join the teleconference, the parties are DIRECTED to dial (859) 474-8484 and enter conference ID 187 753 906 #.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 5/13/2025.(MM)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
20 20 motion For Order Fri 05/09 2:41 PM
AMENDED MOTION for Order by Christopher Ronald Curry for Expedited Response to Requests for Production Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(A) Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(Kane, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Certification Of Noah Kane In Support Of Amended Motion For Expedited Response To Requests For Production Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(B)(2)(A),
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, May 05, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Mon 05/05 11:54 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's motion (D.E.18 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 5/5/2025. (JCP)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
18 18 motion For Order Fri 05/02 6:13 PM
MOTION for Order by Christopher Ronald Curry for Expedited Response to Requests for Production Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(A) Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(Kane, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
notice Notice of Docket Modification Mon 05/05 10:15 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Noah Kane re18 MOTION for Order by Christopher Ronald Curry for Expedited Response to Requests for Production Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(A) ; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit A," "Exhibit B." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (KJA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 04/29 12:00 PM
ORDER re16 Motion for Protective Order: The parties' joint motion for a protective order (D.E. 16) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 4/29/2025. (MM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 motion Protective Order Mon 04/28 6:41 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Christopher Ronald Curry Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(Kane, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
15 15 order Scheduling Order Deadline Thu 04/24 11:11 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. The parties shall exchange initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by April 30, 2025. 2. The parties shall have until July 9, 2025, to amend pleadings and join additional parties. 3. All fact discovery shall be completed on or before December 10, 2025. All expert discovery shall be completed by February 23, 2026. 4. Per the parties' status report (D.E. 14) no later than January 10, 2026, the parties shall disclose the identity of expert witnesses who may be used at trial to establish any claim or counter-claim, accompanied by written reports signed by the Rule 26(a)(2)(B) expert witnesses and/or written summaries consistent with Rule 26(a)(2)(C), as applicable, all in compliance with the rule. These disclosures need not be filed in the Court record. Rebuttal expert disclosures shall be made by January 24, 2026. 5. No later than March 26, 2026, counsel for the parties shall file all dispositive motions. Response and reply time shall be governed by local rule. 6. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 8/15/2025 at 11:30 AM in LONDON before Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram. The call will be off the record and for counsel only. The call will be held over Microsoft Teams and the phone number and conference ID will be provided closer to the date of the meeting. 7. In accordance with District Judge Boom's referral order (D.E. 6), the Court declines at this time to schedule a pretrial conference, trial, or deadlines for related filings. 8. The Court builds the case schedule based on party input. Modification of this schedule is thus disfavored and will only occur under the standards and mechanics of Rule 16 and/or Rule 6, as applicable. 9. Other than the agreed-upon discovery limits within the parties' Rule 26(f) report, the default limits within the discovery rules apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 4/24/2025.(MM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
14 14 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 04/23 4:31 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kane, Noah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order For Meeting and Report Tue 03/25 1:03 PM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. (2) Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: See a. - e. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 3/25/2025.(MM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MJ Consent Form
Monday, March 24, 2025
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/24 2:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Farris, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 02/27 3:34 PM
ORDER: extension request (D.E.10 ) is GRANTED. Defendant's responsive pleading is due on or before March 24, 2025. Future extensions are very unlikely to be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 2/27/2025. (JCP)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/27 12:24 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(Farris, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Extension
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Thu 02/27 12:22 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Farris, Christopher)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 02/27 3:35 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: (JCP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Tue 02/11 3:56 PM
Summons Returned Executed by Christopher Ronald Curry as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 2/10/2025, answer due 3/3/2025. (Kane, Noah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/05 1:00 PM
ORDER: granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Noah Kane. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 2/5/2025. (MM)
Related: [-]
notice Notice for Attorney to Request E-Filing Privileges Wed 02/05 1:05 PM
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Noah Kane: re7 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Noah Kane (MM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
6 6 order REW Standing Case Management and Referral Order Tue 02/04 10:24 AM
STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/04/2021.(JCP)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/04 10:18 AM
MOTION for Noah Kane to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Ronald Curry ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-6025123)Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(Craig, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 notice Attorney Notice Tue 02/04 10:02 AM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Noah Kane by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (JCP)
Related: [-]
misc Conflict Check Tue 02/04 9:59 AM
Conflict Check run. (JCP)
Related: [-]
misc Bar Status Check Tue 02/04 10:29 AM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Noah Kane re5 MOTION for Noah Kane to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Ronald Curry ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-6025123). (JCP)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Tue 02/04 10:29 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Ingram for review: re5 MOTION for Noah Kane to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Ronald Curry ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-6025123) (JCP)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued/Reissued Tue 02/04 9:58 AM
Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and returned to counsel electronically for service. (JCP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/04 9:54 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-6024842), filed by Christopher Ronald Curry.(JCP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Experian Information Solutions