Curry v Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Claria Horn Boom |
Referred: | Hanly A Ingram |
Case #: | 6:25-cv-00014 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Ronald Curry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() MOTION to Compel by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(Farris, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 13, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER re20 AMENDED MOTION for Order by Christopher Ronald Curry for Expedited Response to Requests for Production Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(A) : On May 9, 2025, Plaintiff Curry, through counsel, filed an amended motion for expedited response to a request for production. D.E. 20. In the motion, Plaintiff requests a telephonic status conference before the undersigned to discuss the request. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the TELECONFERENCE is SCHEDULED for 5/21/2025 at11:00 AM . To join the teleconference, the parties are DIRECTED to dial (859) 474-8484 and enter conference ID 187 753 906 #.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 5/13/2025.(MM) |
|
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() AMENDED MOTION for Order by Christopher Ronald Curry for Expedited Response to Requests for Production Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(A) Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(Kane, Noah) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER: Plaintiff's motion (D.E.18 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 5/5/2025. (JCP) |
|
Friday, May 02, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MOTION for Order by Christopher Ronald Curry for Expedited Response to Requests for Production Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(A) Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(Kane, Noah) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
notice
Notice of Docket Modification
Mon 05/05 10:15 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Noah Kane re18 MOTION for Order by Christopher Ronald Curry for Expedited Response to Requests for Production Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(A) ; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit A," "Exhibit B." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (KJA) |
||
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER re16 Motion for Protective Order: The parties' joint motion for a protective order (D.E. 16) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 4/29/2025. (MM) |
|
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() MOTION for Protective Order by Christopher Ronald Curry Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(Kane, Noah) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. The parties shall exchange initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by April 30, 2025. 2. The parties shall have until July 9, 2025, to amend pleadings and join additional parties. 3. All fact discovery shall be completed on or before December 10, 2025. All expert discovery shall be completed by February 23, 2026. 4. Per the parties' status report (D.E. 14) no later than January 10, 2026, the parties shall disclose the identity of expert witnesses who may be used at trial to establish any claim or counter-claim, accompanied by written reports signed by the Rule 26(a)(2)(B) expert witnesses and/or written summaries consistent with Rule 26(a)(2)(C), as applicable, all in compliance with the rule. These disclosures need not be filed in the Court record. Rebuttal expert disclosures shall be made by January 24, 2026. 5. No later than March 26, 2026, counsel for the parties shall file all dispositive motions. Response and reply time shall be governed by local rule. 6. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 8/15/2025 at 11:30 AM in LONDON before Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram. The call will be off the record and for counsel only. The call will be held over Microsoft Teams and the phone number and conference ID will be provided closer to the date of the meeting. 7. In accordance with District Judge Boom's referral order (D.E. 6), the Court declines at this time to schedule a pretrial conference, trial, or deadlines for related filings. 8. The Court builds the case schedule based on party input. Modification of this schedule is thus disfavored and will only occur under the standards and mechanics of Rule 16 and/or Rule 6, as applicable. 9. Other than the agreed-upon discovery limits within the parties' Rule 26(f) report, the default limits within the discovery rules apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 4/24/2025.(MM) |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kane, Noah) |
|
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. (2) Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: See a. - e. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 3/25/2025.(MM) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, March 24, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Farris, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER: extension request (D.E.10 ) is GRANTED. Defendant's responsive pleading is due on or before March 24, 2025. Future extensions are very unlikely to be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 2/27/2025. (JCP) |
|
10 | 10
![]() UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(Farris, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Farris, Christopher) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 02/27 3:35 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: (JCP) |
||
Tuesday, February 11, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Summons Returned Executed by Christopher Ronald Curry as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 2/10/2025, answer due 3/3/2025. (Kane, Noah) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER: granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Noah Kane. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 2/5/2025. (MM) |
|
notice
Notice for Attorney to Request E-Filing Privileges
Wed 02/05 1:05 PM
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Noah Kane: re7 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Noah Kane (MM) |
||
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/04/2021.(JCP) |
|
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Noah Kane to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Ronald Curry ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-6025123)Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram.(Craig, James) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Noah Kane by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (JCP) |
|
misc
Conflict Check
Tue 02/04 9:59 AM
Conflict Check run. (JCP) |
||
misc
Bar Status Check
Tue 02/04 10:29 AM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Noah Kane re5 MOTION for Noah Kane to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Ronald Curry ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-6025123). (JCP) |
||
utility
Motion Submitted
Tue 02/04 10:29 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Ingram for review: re5 MOTION for Noah Kane to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Ronald Curry ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-6025123) (JCP) |
||
Monday, February 03, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and returned to counsel electronically for service. (JCP) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-6024842), filed by Christopher Ronald Curry.(JCP) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |