Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-03270

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:D Sims Crawford
Case #: 2:25-ap-00006
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
John Wesley Hollington
460 Hillandell Drive
Birmingham, AL 35244
Represented By
John Wesley Hollington
contact info
Defendant
Hollington Pools, LLC
460 Hillandell Drive
Birmingham, AL 35244
Represented By
Hollington Pools, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Haney
Sylvion Moss, Esq. Law Works, LLC 2100 First Ave N. S. 500
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Sylvion Moss
Law Works, LLC
contact info
Trustee
Bradford W. Caraway
Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P O Box 10848
Birmingham, AL 35202


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 05/02 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order Rescheduling Hearing
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Hearing Wed 04/30 8:46 AM
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #1; Status Conference on Complaint Objecting to Discharge and/or Dischargeability of Debt. Hearing scheduled 05/21/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham (stc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 4:39 PM
Certificate of Service on Distinctive Pools and Spas, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Steven G. Haney. (Moss, Sylvion)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 04/23 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Hearing
Monday, April 21, 2025
22 22 court Notice of Hearing-Van200 Mon 04/21 2:57 PM
Notice of Hearing on Related [+] Hearing scheduled 5/21/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (jlp)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Steven G. Haney
21 21 motion Default Judgment Mon 04/21 11:59 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Hollington Pools, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Steven G. Haney Default Judgment Motion due by 05/21/2025. (Tomlinson, Frank)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 04/19 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Clerk's Entry of Default
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 04/19 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, April 18, 2025
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 04/18 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, April 17, 2025
17 17 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 04/17 2:55 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference (Distinctive Pools and Spas, LLC DBA Hollington Pools, LLC) Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/21/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (jlp)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steven G. Haney
16 16 court Clerk Entry of Default Thu 04/17 2:23 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] (jlp)
Related: [-] 12 Application for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Steven G. Haney
15 15 court Clerk Entry of Default Thu 04/17 2:14 PM
Amended Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] (jlp)
Related: [-] 9 Application for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Steven G. Haney,10 Clerk's Entry of Default
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
14 14 court Notice of Hearing-Van200 Wed 04/16 2:28 PM
Notice of Hearing on Related [+] Hearing scheduled 5/21/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (jlp)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Steven Haney
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
13 13 motion Default Judgment Tue 04/15 4:48 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant/Debtor John Wesley Hollington Filed by Plaintiff Steven Haney Default Judgment Motion due by 05/15/2025. (Tomlinson, Frank)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Entry of Default Tue 04/15 4:46 PM
Request/Affidavit for Clerk's Entry of Default - Application for Entry of Default against Defendant Hollington Pools, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Steven Haney (Tomlinson, Frank) Modified on 4/16/2025 to edit text to match pdf (jlp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Entry of default
Saturday, April 05, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 04/05 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 04/05/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Clerk's Entry of Default
Thursday, April 03, 2025
10 10 court Clerk Entry of Default Thu 04/03 2:34 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] (jlp)
Related: [-] 9 Application for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Steven Haney
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
9 9 motion Entry of Default Wed 04/02 3:31 PM
Application for Entry of Default Filed by Plaintiff Steven Haney (Tomlinson, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default
Friday, March 21, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 03/21 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 03/21/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Rescheduling Hearing
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Hearing Wed 03/19 2:39 PM
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #1; Pretrial Conference on Complaint Objecting to Discharge and/or Dischargeability of Debt. Hearing scheduled 04/30/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham (stc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 03/18 3:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Co-Counsel Sylvion Moss by Frank Hilton-Green Tomlinson Filed by Plaintiff Steven Haney. (Tomlinson, Frank)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/18 2:45 PM
First Summons Service Executed on John Wesley Hollington 2/22/2025 (Moss, Sylvion)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/18 2:44 PM
First Summons Service Executed on Hollington Pools, LLC 3/9/2025 (Moss, Sylvion)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
3 3 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 02/04 1:39 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference (Hollington Pools, LLC) Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/19/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (dls)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steven Haney
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 02/04 1:13 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference (John Wesley Hollington) Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/19/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (dls)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steven Haney
Monday, February 03, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/03 7:59 PM
Adversary case 25-00006 41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) Complaint by Steven Haney against John Wesley Hollington, Hollington Pools, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Moss, Sylvion)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B