Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:24-bk-50679

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 5:25-ap-05002
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Terminated:May 06, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kimberly Kay Berscheid
916 1st St S Apt 3
Sauk Rapids, MN 56379
Plaintiff
Eugene Gerald Walcheski
10321 115th Street NE Apt. 3
Gilman, MN 56333
Represented By
Ross William Montgomery
Pcg Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
utility Disposition of adversary Tue 05/06 10:04 AM
Disposition of adversary 5:25-ap-5002. Disposition: DISMISSED. (AVP)
Related: [-]
court Close adversary case Tue 05/06 10:06 AM
Adversary case 5:25-ap-5002 closed (AVP)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Dismissal (Adversary) Mon 05/05 3:15 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Eugene Gerald Walcheski. Proof of Service.. (Montgomery, Ross)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
15 15 misc Notice of appearance and request for notice Sat 04/26 10:10 AM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Sam Calvert Law Office PA and Sam Calvert. (Calvert, Sam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/10 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
13 13 audio PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Tue 04/08 5:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [04/08/2025 01:30:00 PM]. File Size [ 3810 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:48 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Default Judgment - motion Tue 04/08 4:30 PM
Order Denying Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] (DP)
Related: [-] 10
court CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Tue 04/08 2:07 PM
Minutes re:10 Motion for Default Judgment. Appearances by Ross Montgomery for the Plaintiff and Kimberly Berscheid, pro se. Based on the record, order denying motion to be entered. (DH)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
court Public entry Mon 03/31 10:40 AM
Scheduling Conference STRICKEN re:6 Order for scheduling conference (AVP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to complaint Fri 03/28 3:27 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Kimberly Kay Berscheid. (AVP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
10 10 motion Motion for Default Judgment Wed 03/19 3:36 PM
Amended Motion for Default Judgment re:9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Eugene Gerald Walcheski. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2025 at 01:30 PM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). (Montgomery, Ross)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Motion for Default Judgment Wed 03/19 11:13 AM
Motion for Default Judgment filed by Eugene Gerald Walcheski. Affidavit of Default, Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment, Proof of Service. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2025 at 01:30 PM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). (Montgomery, Ross)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Motion for Default Judgment Wed 03/19 10:48 AM
FILED IN ERROR Motion for Default Judgment filed by Eugene Gerald Walcheski. Affidavit of Default, Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment, Proof of Service. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2025 at 01:30 PM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). (Montgomery, Ross)Modified on 3/19/2025 (AVP)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 16, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 03/16 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order for scheduling conference Fri 03/14 11:54 AM
Order for scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/1/2025 at 01:30 PM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (Duluth). (AVP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/06 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 02/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/05 10:38 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Eugene Gerald Walcheski.(Montgomery, Ross)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
3 3 court Pro bono notice to defendants Tue 02/04 5:05 PM
Pro Bono notice to defendants re:1 Complaint (admin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 02/04 9:49 AM
Summons issued on Kimberly Kay Berscheid Date Issued 2/4/2025, Answer Due 3/6/2025 (SKP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/04 8:44 AM
Adversary case 25-05002 (65 (Dischargeability - other)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Eugene Gerald Walcheski against Kimberly Kay Berscheid. Fee Amount $350.00. (Montgomery, Ross)
Related: [-]