Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-20233

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 12
Judge:Robert L Jones
Case #: 2:25-ap-02002
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jason Tyler Fehr
1910 Zuni Trail
Dalhart, TX 79022
Represented By
Jason Tyler Fehr
contact info
Defendant
Brittaney Alice Fehr
1910 Zuni Trail
Dalhart, TX 79022
Represented By
Brittaney Alice Fehr
contact info
Plaintiff
Agrifund, LLC
420 Throckmorton Street Suite 1100
Fort Worth, TX 76102
Represented By
Michael S. Smiley
Underwood Law Firm
contact info
Samantha Espino
Underwood Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
16 16 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 05/16 11:21 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Agreed Order granting motion to continue hearing. The Docket Call will be held on the Court's regularly scheduled docket call in May of 2026 via WebEx https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/everett (related document13 ) (related documents Complaint, Summons issued, Summons service executed, Summons service executed) Entered on 5/14/2025. .
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
15 15 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Wed 05/14 2:13 PM
Agreed Scheduling order setting deadlines. The Docket Call will be held on the Court's regularly scheduled docket call in May of 2026 via WebEx. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Entered on 5/14/2025 (Billings, Emma)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Agrifund, LLC
14 14 order Continue Wed 05/14 2:09 PM
Agreed Order granting motion to continue hearing. The Docket Call will be held on the Court's regularly scheduled docket call in May of 2026 via WebEx https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/everett Related [+] Entered on 5/14/2025. (Billings, Emma)
Related: [-] ument13 Complaint, Summons issued, Summons service executed, Summons service executed
Friday, May 09, 2025
13 13 motion Continue Fri 05/09 10:02 AM
Motion to continue hearing on Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Agrifund, LLC (Espino, Samantha)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons issued
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Wed 04/16 11:21 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order reassigning case - Judge Robert L Jones terminated. Judge Scott W Everett assigned. Entered on 4/14/2025 (Ecker, C.)
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 order Reassigning case Mon 04/14 4:36 PM
Order reassigning case - Judge Robert L Jones terminated. Judge Scott W Everett assigned. Entered on 4/14/2025 (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
10 10 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 04/10 11:22 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order granting motion to substitute attorney adding David R. Langston for Brittaney Alice Fehr and Jason Tyler Fehr, terminating Brad W. Odell. (related document8 ) Entered on 4/8/2025. (Noble, N.)
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
9 9 order Substitute attorney Tue 04/08 10:55 AM
Order granting motion to substitute attorney adding David R. Langston for Brittaney Alice Fehr and Jason Tyler Fehr, terminating Brad W. Odell. Related [+] Entered on 4/8/2025. (Noble, N.)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, April 04, 2025
8 8 motion Substitute attorney Fri 04/04 3:55 PM
Agreed Motion to substitute attorney Brad W. Odell with David R. Langston filed by Defendants Brittaney Alice Fehr, Jason Tyler Fehr (Odell, Brad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to complaint Mon 03/10 3:48 PM
Answer to complaint filed by Brittaney Alice Fehr, Jason Tyler Fehr. (Odell, Brad)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
6 6 cmp Summons service executed Mon 02/10 4:41 PM
Summons service executed on Brittaney Alice Fehr 2/10/2025 (Espino, Samantha) Modified on 2/11/2025 (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons service executed Mon 02/10 4:20 PM
Summons service executed on Agrifund, LLC 2/10/2025 (Espino, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
4 4 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Thu 02/06 4:07 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 6/18/2025 at 01:30 PM Amarillo via WebEx. Entered on 2/6/2025 (Graham, C.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Agrifund, LLC
3 3 court Summons issued Thu 02/06 4:05 PM
Summons issued on Brittaney Alice Fehr Answer Due 3/10/2025; Jason Tyler Fehr Answer Due 3/10/2025 (Graham, C.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
2 2 misc Adversary proceeding cover sheet Tue 02/04 10:58 AM
Adversary proceeding cover sheet filed by Plaintiff Agrifund, LLC Related [+]. (Espino, Samantha)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/04 10:50 AM
Adversary case 25-02002 Complaint by Agrifund, LLC against Jason Tyler Fehr, Brittaney Alice Fehr. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny). 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury). (Espino, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D