Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Greg Kays
Case #: 4:25-cv-00076
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 1:17 PM CDT
Defendant
Jennifer B. Higgins
Plaintiff
Ricki Jane Sheldon
Represented By
Jesse M Bless
Bless Litigation
contact info
Rekha Sharma-Crawford
Sharma-Crawford Attorneys At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/09 1:44 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer re7 Amended Complaint,, filed by Cari Franke Walsh on behalf of Kika Scott. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/23/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Walsh, Cari)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/25 4:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jennifer B. Higgins filed by Jesse M Bless on behalf of Ricki Jane Sheldon.(Bless, Jesse) Due to clerical error, the amended complaint was deleted. The original has been refiled. (Grassano, William).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/28/2025) Exhibit A,
Att: 2 (4/28/2025) Exhibit B,
Att: 3 (4/28/2025) Exhibit C
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/14 11:46 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF JURISDICTION filed by Cari Franke Walsh on behalf of Jennifer B. Higgins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/28/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Cari Franke Walsh added to party Jennifer B. Higgins(pty:dft))(Walsh, Cari)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
5 5 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed as to USA Wed 03/26 10:01 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Ricki Jane Sheldon. Jennifer B. Higgins served on 2/13/2025, answer due 4/14/2025.(Bless, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Electronic Receipts
Thursday, February 06, 2025
4 4 12 pgs order Order Thu 02/06 2:55 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER. All attorneys and unrepresented parties shall carefully study and comply with the ISO along with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Western District of Missouri's Local Rules (the Local Rules). Failure to comply with the ISO may result in the Court imposing sanctions, including but not limited to monetary payments, dismissal of claims or cases, entry of default judgment, or other appropriate sanctions. Signed on 2/6/25 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
3 3 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/04 1:15 PM
ORDER granting2 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Jesse M Bless for Ricki Jane Sheldon allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/04 12:44 PM
Motion to allow Jesse M. Bless to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9423032) filed by Rekha Sharma-Crawford on behalf of Ricki Jane Sheldon. (Sharma-Crawford, Rekha)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/04 12:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Jennifer B. Higgins filed by Rekha Sharma-Crawford on behalf of Ricki Jane Sheldon. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9422992. Service due by 5/5/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Sharma-Crawford, Rekha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet
service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 02/04 3:14 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jennifer B. Higgins, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]