Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Referred: Panayotta D Augustin-Bir
Case #: 0:25-cv-60193
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 1:56 PM EDT
Defendant
BARRY REVZEN
Represented By
Andrew J. Dominguez
Akerman LLP
contact info
Defendant
DG BRANDS, INC
Plaintiff
MATRIX BRAND DYNAMICS LLC
Represented By
Joel Benjamin Rothman
Sriplaw, P.A.
contact info
George Nicholas Colville
Sriplaw
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
32 32 respm Reply in Support of Motion Thu 05/01 10:45 AM
REPLY in Support of Motion re8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by DG Brands, Inc.. (Chapman, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
31 31 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/30 1:42 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by DG Brands, Inc. (Chapman, John)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Sat 04/26 3:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Amended Response (amends ECF 29) filed by Matrix Brand Dynamics LLC. Replies due by 5/5/2025. (Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/25 5:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matrix Brand Dynamics LLC. Replies due by 5/2/2025.(Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration on behalf of Plaintiff in support
Thursday, April 24, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 04/24 2:56 PM
ORDER denying26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz See attached document for full details. (lsk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/23 4:39 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DG Brands, Inc.. Replies due by 4/30/2025. (Chapman, John)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 04/23 4:29 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Matrix Brand Dynamics LLC. (Colville, George)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 04/23 9:26 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice24 Second Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/22/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 04/22 6:14 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Matrix Brand Dynamics LLC. (Colville, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
23 23 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 04/18 8:41 AM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 4/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
22 22 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/16 10:06 AM
ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 6/15/2026 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge David S. Leibowitz., Calendar Call set for 6/9/2026 02:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge David S. Leibowitz.), ( Mediation Deadline 1/6/2026.). Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/16/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Party Wed 04/16 10:01 AM
Order Dismissing Party Barry Revzen without prejudice re20 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/16/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Tue 04/15 3:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Barry Revzen, Only by MATRIX BRAND DYNAMICS LLC, BARRY REVZEN(Colville, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
19 19 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Tue 04/15 3:48 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by MATRIX BRAND DYNAMICS LLC, DG BRANDS, INC, BARRY REVZEN (Colville, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
18 18 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/08 4:41 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed Certificate of Interested Parties by BARRY REVZEN (Dominguez, Andrew)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Tue 04/08 8:19 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney George Nicholas Colville (pt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/08 9:37 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/15/2025 Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/07 7:04 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by MATRIX BRAND DYNAMICS LLC (Colville, George)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/07 4:24 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Joint Scheduling Report re9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by MATRIX BRAND DYNAMICS LLC. Responses due by 4/21/2025. (Colville, George)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Mon 04/07 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; by George Nicholas Colville (Colville, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 03/28 9:13 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Responses due by 4/22/2025. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 3/27/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 03/27 1:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MATRIX BRAND DYNAMICS LLC. (Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/25 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Chapman on behalf of DG BRANDS, INC. Attorney John Chapman added to party DG BRANDS, INC(pty:dft). (Chapman, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 03/19 10:24 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/8/2025 Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 3/18/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
8 8 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/18 11:54 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, ( Responses due by 4/1/2025.), Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DG BRANDS, INC, BARRY REVZEN.(Dominguez, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Defendant DG Brands, Inc.,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Defendant Barry Revzen
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/18 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew J. Dominguez on behalf of BARRY REVZEN. Attorney Andrew J. Dominguez added to party BARRY REVZEN(pty:dft). (Dominguez, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 03/04 8:01 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MATRIX BRAND DYNAMICS LLC. DG BRANDS, INC served on 2/20/2025, response/answer due 3/13/2025. (Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 02/27 9:59 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MATRIX BRAND DYNAMICS LLC. BARRY REVZEN served on 2/25/2025, response/answer due 3/18/2025. (Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 02/06 11:07 AM
ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 2/5/2025. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 02/05 9:16 AM
Summons Issued as to DG BRANDS, INC, BARRY REVZEN. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 02/05 9:13 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/04 3:54 PM
COMPLAINT against DG BRANDS, INC. f/k/a LOVIN ENTERPRISES, INC. d/b/a DREAMGIRL INTERNATIONAL d/b/a DG BRANDS, BARRY REVZEN. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18178003, filed by MATRIX BRAND DYNAMICS LLC.(Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Signed Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Material Breach,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summon(s) Proposed Summons,
Att: 5 Summon(s) Proposed Summons